EP2117881 - THERMOPLASTIC FILM FOR AIRBAG COVERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Benecke-Kaliko AG Beneckeallee 40 30419 Hannover / DE | For all designated states Johnson Controls Interiors GmbH & Co. KG Mülhausener Strasse 35 47929 Grefrath / DE | [2009/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÜHRING, Jürgen Dr. Johannesgrund 16 30900 Wedemark / DE | 02 /
FISCHER, Katja Bahnhofstr. 5 96364 Marktrodach / DE | 03 /
HÜLSEWEDE, Volker In den Wintergärten 12 73114 Schlat / DE | 04 /
MARQUARDT, Jürgen Urbanstr. 2 79104 Freiburg / DE | 05 /
HARNISCH, Hartmut Finkenstrasse 2 47929 Grefrath / DE | [2009/49] |
Former [2009/47] | 01 /
BÜHRING, Jürgen Kleiststr. 56 73033 Göppingen / DE | ||
02 /
FISCHER, Katja Oberdorfstr. 18 70794 Filderstadt / DE | |||
03 /
HÜLSEWEDE, Volker Reutenbergweg 6 73037 Göppingen / DE | |||
04 /
MARQUARDT, Jürgen Urbanstr. 2 79104 Freiburg / DE | |||
05 /
HARNISCH, Hartmut Finkenstrasse 2 47929 Grefrath / DE | Representative(s) | Finger, Karsten Continental Aktiengesellschaft Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 169 30001 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Finger, Karsten Continental Aktiengesellschaft Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 169 30001 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 08707894.5 | 15.01.2008 | [2009/47] | WO2008EP50357 | Priority number, date | DE20071007619 | 13.02.2007 Original published format: DE102007007619 | DE20071015765 | 30.03.2007 Original published format: DE102007015765 | [2009/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008098809 | Date: | 21.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2117881 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2117881 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/215 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
B32B5/18 (EP,US);
B32B3/26 (EP,US);
B32B7/022 (EP,US);
B60R21/215 (EP,US);
Y10T428/15 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24273 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24479 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24983 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249953 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | THERMOPLASTISCHE FOLIE FÜR AIRBAG-ABDECKUNGEN | [2009/47] | English: | THERMOPLASTIC FILM FOR AIRBAG COVERS | [2009/47] | French: | FEUILLE THERMOPLASTIQUE POUR COUVERCLE DE COUSSIN GONFLABLE | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 04.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.10.2010 | DK | 13.10.2010 | EE | 13.10.2010 | FI | 13.10.2010 | HR | 13.10.2010 | HU | 13.10.2010 | IE | 13.10.2010 | IT | 13.10.2010 | LT | 13.10.2010 | LV | 13.10.2010 | MT | 13.10.2010 | NL | 13.10.2010 | RO | 13.10.2010 | SE | 13.10.2010 | SI | 13.10.2010 | TR | 13.10.2010 | BG | 13.01.2011 | NO | 13.01.2011 | GR | 14.01.2011 | LU | 15.01.2011 | ES | 24.01.2011 | BE | 31.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | IS | 13.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 13.10.2010 | |
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
HR | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
MT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
TR | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
NO | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
LU | 15.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 13.10.2010 | |
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
HR | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
MT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
NO | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
LU | 15.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | DK | 13.10.2010 | |
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
HR | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
MT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
NO | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
LU | 15.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | DK | 13.10.2010 | |
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
HR | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
MT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
NO | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | DK | 13.10.2010 | |
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
HR | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
NO | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | DK | 13.10.2010 | |
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
HR | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
NO | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | DK | 13.10.2010 | |
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
HR | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
NO | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | DK | 13.10.2010 | |
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
HR | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
NO | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | EE | 13.10.2010 | |
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
HR | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
NO | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | FI | 13.10.2010 | |
HR | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
NO | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | FI | 13.10.2010 | |
HR | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
NO | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19533367 (YMOS AG IND PRODUKTE [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]DE19636428 (JENOPTIK JENA GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1; | [A]US5863064 (RHEINLANDER FRED [US], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [DA]DE10055546 (ARADEX AG [DE], et al) [DA] 1; | [A]DE10244311 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US6753057 (GARDNER JR JOHN A [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]EP1518662 (ANTOLIN GRUPO ING SA [ES]) [DA] 1; | [A]EP1745989 (DRAEXLMAIER LISA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * |