01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
25.02.2022 |
Patent maintained (B2 publication) |
published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] |
18.02.2022 |
New entry: Fee for printing new specification paid |
|
15.11.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended |
|
09.11.2021 |
New entry: Legal effect of interlocutory decision |
|
29.07.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision |
|
29.07.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
21.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
20.10.2020 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
09.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
21.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
13.07.2020 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
02.03.2020 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
21.02.2020 |
Opposition filed |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
31.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
05.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
01.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
12.04.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] |
05.04.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
05.04.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
05.04.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
25.01.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.01.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.02.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.07.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.03.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.01.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.02.2014 |
Change - representative |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
31.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.03.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.03.2012 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.01.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.11.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.02.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.03.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] |
19.03.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.01.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.11.2009 |
First examination report |
|
10.11.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.09.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] |
25.09.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] |
14.07.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.08.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.07.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.03.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|