Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8263564 | Global Dossier | 11.09.2012 | B2 | US2010035830 | 11.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP50387 | 15.01.2008 | EP07100803 | 19.01.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101200992B | Global Dossier | 13.11.2012 | B1 | KR20090102861 | 30.09.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP50387 | 15.01.2008 | EP07100803 | 19.01.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5225289B | Global Dossier | 03.07.2013 | B2 | JP2010516828 | 20.05.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP50387 | 15.01.2008 | EP07100803 | 19.01.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2008206969B | Global Dossier | 06.12.2012 | B2 | AU2008206969 | 24.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP50387 | 15.01.2008 | EP07100803 | 19.01.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2111416 | Global Dossier | 30.03.2022 | B2 | EP2111416 | 15.05.2019 | B1 | EP2111416 | 28.10.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP50387 | 15.01.2008 | EP07100803 | 19.01.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0807037 | 22.04.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP50387 | 15.01.2008 | EP07100803 | 19.01.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2675117 | 25.03.2014 | C | CA2675117 | 24.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP50387 | 15.01.2008 | EP07100803 | 19.01.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101589064B | 29.01.2014 | B | CN101589064 | 25.11.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP50387 | 15.01.2008 | EP07100803 | 19.01.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2732290T | 07.06.2022 | T5 | ES2732290T | 21.11.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP50387 | 15.01.2008 | EP07100803 | 19.01.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1135417 | 04.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP50387 | 15.01.2008 | EP07100803 | 19.01.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL199726 | 28.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP50387 | 15.01.2008 | EP07100803 | 19.01.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MA31113 | 04.01.2010 | B1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP50387 | 15.01.2008 | EP07100803 | 19.01.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2009007695 | 29.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP50387 | 15.01.2008 | EP07100803 | 19.01.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ578457 | 26.08.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP50387 | 15.01.2008 | EP07100803 | 19.01.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TN2009000303 | 31.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008EP50387 | 15.01.2008 | EP07100803 | 19.01.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008087135 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07100803 | 19.01.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1947120 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07100803 | 19.01.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR064786 | 22.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07100803 | 19.01.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2008000140 | 16.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07100803 | 19.01.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GT200900204 | 22.07.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | EP07100803 | 19.01.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY148299 | 29.03.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP07100803 | 19.01.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE20090187 | 15.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07100803 | 19.01.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2423122 | 10.07.2011 | C2 | RU2009131464 | 10.03.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | EP07100803 | 19.01.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SA08290017 | 13.09.2011 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP07100803 | 19.01.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI388330B | 11.03.2013 | B | TW200835511 | 01.09.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | EP07100803 | 19.01.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200905738 | 26.05.2010 | B | Priority number | Date | EP07100803 | 19.01.2007 |