EP2111416 - IRON-HYDROCARBON COMPLEX COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIFOR (INTERNATIONAL) AG Rechenstrasse 37 9001 St. Gallen / CH | [2009/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REIM, Stefan Wolfgangstrasse 6 CH-9014 St. Gallen / CH | 02 /
GEISSER, Peter Marweesstrasse 8 CH-9014 St. Gallen / CH | [2009/44] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/13] |
Former [2014/11] | Gille Hrabal Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2009/44] | Bröcher, Dirk Joachim Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Brucknerstr. 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 08707897.8 | 15.01.2008 | [2009/44] | WO2008EP50387 | Priority number, date | EP20070100803 | 19.01.2007 Original published format: EP 07100803 | [2009/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008087135 | Date: | 24.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2111416 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2111416 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/20] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2111416 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08B37/00, C07H23/00, C08B37/16, C08B37/02, A61K33/26, A61K31/715 | [2009/44] | CPC: |
C08B31/00 (EP,US);
C08B37/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/7135 (EP,US);
A61K31/715 (KR);
A61K33/26 (EP,KR,US);
A61P3/12 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
C07H23/00 (KR);
C08B37/0021 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/20] |
Former [2009/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | EISEN-KOHLENHYDRAT-KOMPLEX-VERBINDUNGEN | [2009/44] | English: | IRON-HYDROCARBON COMPLEX COMPOUNDS | [2009/44] | French: | COMPOSÉS COMPLEXES DE FER/GLUCIDES | [2009/44] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/44] | 13.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.02.2020
17.02.2020
ADMISSIBLE N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL Opponent's representative Schrell, Andreas Gleiss Große Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/13] | 03.03.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.07.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.07.2021 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.07.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.07.2021 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.07.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 16.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 16.02.2022 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 18.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.01.2008 | CY | 15.05.2019 | CZ | 15.05.2019 | DK | 15.05.2019 | EE | 15.05.2019 | FI | 15.05.2019 | HR | 15.05.2019 | LT | 15.05.2019 | LV | 15.05.2019 | MC | 15.05.2019 | MT | 15.05.2019 | PL | 15.05.2019 | RO | 15.05.2019 | SE | 15.05.2019 | SI | 15.05.2019 | SK | 15.05.2019 | TR | 15.05.2019 | BG | 15.08.2019 | NO | 15.08.2019 | GR | 16.08.2019 | IS | 15.09.2019 | PT | 15.09.2019 | AT | 15.01.2020 | IE | 15.01.2020 | LU | 15.01.2020 | BE | 31.01.2020 | [2022/30] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 15.01.2008 | |
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
MT | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
AT | 15.01.2020 | ||
IE | 15.01.2020 | ||
LU | 15.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | CZ | 15.05.2019 | |
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
AT | 15.01.2020 | ||
IE | 15.01.2020 | ||
LU | 15.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 15.05.2019 | |
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
IE | 15.01.2020 | ||
LU | 15.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | CZ | 15.05.2019 | |
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
LU | 15.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | CZ | 15.05.2019 | |
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
LU | 15.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | CZ | 15.05.2019 | |
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | CZ | 15.05.2019 | |
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | CZ | 15.05.2019 | |
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | CZ | 15.05.2019 | |
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | CZ | 15.05.2019 | |
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 15.05.2019 | |
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | FI | 15.05.2019 | |
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | FI | 15.05.2019 | |
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | FI | 15.05.2019 | |
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 15.05.2019 | |
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 15.05.2019 | |
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]RU2198665 ; | [X]GB1111929 (BAYER AG) [X] 10-12,15,17,19-27 * examples 1,2,6 * * claim - * * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 31 *; | [X]EP0044050 (HAUSMANN AG LABOR [CH]) [X] 1-27 * page 3, line 6 - page 8, line 5 * * example . *; | [A]US6461651 (LEUSNER STEVEN J [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * claim - *; | [DA]WO2004037865 (VIFOR INT AG [CH], et al) [DA] 1-27* page 5 - page 6; example - *; | [X]WO2005000210 (CHROMACEUTICAL ADVANCED TECH [US]) [X] 1-27 * examples 12,13 *; | [X]WO2005116046 (CILAG AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-27 * page 1, line 1 - line 25 * * page 5, line 8 - page 6, line 14 * * page 7, line 14 - line 22 * * example - *; | [X] - "Method for preparing iron-containing medicinal agent", DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2003, no. 71, Database accession no. 2003-754172, XP002449716 & RU2198665 C1 20030220 (A BIO CO LTD) [X] 1-27 * abstract * | [ ] - CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 139:169280, URL: STN [ ] * column A * | Opposition | BRPI0303685 | EP0297681 | EP0297680 | DE3844065 | WO2006006897 | - WIKIPEDIA ARTICLE, 2 October 2020 (2020-10-02), XP055689855, Retrieved from the Internet | - Demaeyer, Et Al, "Preventing and controlling iron deficiency Anaemia trough primary health care", World Health Organization Geneva, (19890101), XP055689861 |