EP2121807 - THIIRANE-TERMINATED POLYSULFIDE POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [2009/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WITZEL, Silke Luisenstrasse 56 D-42103 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
KOTTNER, Nils Im Eschle 15 D-78628 Rottweil / DE | 03 /
ZEITLER, Michael Im Wiesengrund 18 D-53347 Alfter / DE | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis, et al Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis, et al Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Application number, filing date | 08707985.1 | 18.01.2008 | [2009/48] | WO2008EP50540 | Priority number, date | EP20070101024 | 23.01.2007 Original published format: EP 07101024 | US20070899273P | 02.02.2007 Original published format: US 899273 P | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008090086 | Date: | 31.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2121807 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2121807 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08G75/00 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
C08G75/14 (EP);
C08G75/08 (EP);
C08L81/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | THIIRAN-TERMINIERTE POLYSULFIDPOLYMERE | [2009/52] | English: | THIIRANE-TERMINATED POLYSULFIDE POLYMERS | [2009/48] | French: | POLYMÈRES POLYSULFURES À TERMINAISON THIIRANE | [2009/48] |
Former [2009/48] | THRIANTERMINIERTE POLYSULFIDPOLYMERE | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 04.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.05.2010 | BE | 26.05.2010 | CZ | 26.05.2010 | DK | 26.05.2010 | EE | 26.05.2010 | FI | 26.05.2010 | HR | 26.05.2010 | HU | 26.05.2010 | IT | 26.05.2010 | LT | 26.05.2010 | LV | 26.05.2010 | MT | 26.05.2010 | NL | 26.05.2010 | PL | 26.05.2010 | PT | 26.05.2010 | RO | 26.05.2010 | SE | 26.05.2010 | SI | 26.05.2010 | SK | 26.05.2010 | TR | 26.05.2010 | CY | 16.06.2010 | BG | 26.08.2010 | NO | 26.08.2010 | GR | 27.08.2010 | ES | 06.09.2010 | IS | 26.09.2010 | IE | 18.01.2011 | LU | 18.01.2011 | FR | 31.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/45] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
HR | 26.05.2010 | ||
HU | 26.05.2010 | ||
IT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
MT | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PT | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
TR | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
BG | 26.08.2010 | ||
NO | 26.08.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
IE | 18.01.2011 | ||
LU | 18.01.2011 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
HR | 26.05.2010 | ||
IT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
MT | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PT | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
TR | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
BG | 26.08.2010 | ||
NO | 26.08.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
IE | 18.01.2011 | ||
LU | 18.01.2011 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
HR | 26.05.2010 | ||
IT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
MT | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PT | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
BG | 26.08.2010 | ||
NO | 26.08.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
IE | 18.01.2011 | ||
LU | 18.01.2011 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/32] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
HR | 26.05.2010 | ||
IT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
MT | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PT | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
NO | 26.08.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
IE | 18.01.2011 | ||
LU | 18.01.2011 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
HR | 26.05.2010 | ||
IT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
MT | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
NO | 26.08.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
IE | 18.01.2011 | ||
LU | 18.01.2011 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
HR | 26.05.2010 | ||
IT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
MT | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
NO | 26.08.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
IE | 18.01.2011 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
HR | 26.05.2010 | ||
IT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
MT | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
NO | 26.08.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
HR | 26.05.2010 | ||
IT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
NO | 26.08.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
HR | 26.05.2010 | ||
IT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
NO | 26.08.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
HR | 26.05.2010 | ||
IT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
NO | 26.08.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5173549 (BOOTH DAVID L [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-20 * * examples *; | [A]WO03076487 (THIOPLAST CHEMICALS GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-13 * * examples *; | [A]JP2004062057 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [A]WO2004099283 (THIOPLAST CHEMICALS GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-25 * * examples * |