EP2111547 - Free-flow electrophoresis using separation and stabilizing media [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/44] | STABILIZING AND SEPARATION MEDIA FOR ELECTROPHORESIS APPLICATIONS | ||
[2012/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1180 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBER, Gerhard Margeritenweg 23 85551 Kirchheim/Heimstetten / DE | [2009/44] | Representative(s) | Eder, Michael df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Eder, Michael df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/44] | Eder, Michael df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08708003.2 | 18.01.2008 | [2009/44] | WO2008EP50597 | Priority number, date | US20070885792P | 19.01.2007 Original published format: US 885792 P | [2009/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008087218 | Date: | 24.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2111547 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2111547 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/447 | [2009/44] | CPC: |
G01N27/44747 (EP);
G01N27/44769 (EP);
G01N27/44795 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/44] | Title | German: | Free-Flow-Elektrophorese mithilfe von Trenn- und Stabilisierungsmedien | [2012/38] | English: | Free-flow electrophoresis using separation and stabilizing media | [2012/38] | French: | Électrophorèse à écoulement libre utilisant des milieux de séparation et de stabilisation | [2012/38] |
Former [2009/44] | STABILISIERUNGS- UND TRENNMEDIEN FÜR ELEKTROPHORETISCHE ANWENDUNGEN | ||
Former [2009/44] | STABILIZING AND SEPARATION MEDIA FOR ELECTROPHORESIS APPLICATIONS | ||
Former [2009/44] | MILIEUX DE STABILISATION ET DE SÉPARATION POUR APPLICATIONS D'ÉLECTROPHORÈSE | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/44] | 30.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/12] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 13.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.04.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.01.2008 | AT | 10.04.2013 | BE | 10.04.2013 | CY | 10.04.2013 | CZ | 10.04.2013 | DK | 10.04.2013 | EE | 10.04.2013 | FI | 10.04.2013 | HR | 10.04.2013 | LT | 10.04.2013 | LV | 10.04.2013 | MC | 10.04.2013 | MT | 10.04.2013 | NL | 10.04.2013 | PL | 10.04.2013 | RO | 10.04.2013 | SE | 10.04.2013 | SI | 10.04.2013 | SK | 10.04.2013 | TR | 10.04.2013 | BG | 10.07.2013 | NO | 10.07.2013 | GR | 11.07.2013 | IS | 10.08.2013 | PT | 12.08.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 18.01.2008 | |
AT | 10.04.2013 | ||
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
MT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
MT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 10.04.2013 | |
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | SI | 10.04.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004101973 (WEBER GERHARD [DE]) [X] 3,4,50,51,57,80,81,87 * paragraph [0026]; figures 2,3 *; | [DX]US5447612 (BIER MILAN [US] ET AL) [DX] 3,4 * column 14, lines 39-50; figure 2 *; | [A] - KALTOFEN R. ET AL., Tabellenbuch Chemie, LEIPZIG, DEUTSCHER VERLAG FÜR GRUNDSTOFFINDUSTRIE, (1986), XP002485557 [A] * tables 12.4-12.7,17.1,17.2 * | [X] - CANUT H ET AL, "Separation of plant membranes by electromigration techniques", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B : BIOMEDICAL APPLICATIONS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NL, (19990205), vol. 722, no. 1-2, ISSN 0378-4347, pages 121 - 139, XP004156209 [X] 3,4,122-151 * paragraphs [2.2.2.] , [3.1.]; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-4347(98)00484-8 | [X] - WEBER GERHARD ET AL, "Application of binary buffer systems to free flow cell electrophoresis", ELECTROPHORESIS, (200001), vol. 21, no. 2, ISSN 0173-0835, pages 325 - 328, XP007905966 [X] 3,4,122-151 * paragraph [3.1.] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1522-2683(20000101)21:2<325::AID-ELPS325>3.0.CO;2-P | [X] - WEBER GERHARD ET AL, "Counterbalancing hydrodynamic sample distortion effects increases resolution of free-flow zone electrophoresis", ELECTROPHORESIS, (199806), vol. 19, no. 7, ISSN 0173-0835, pages 1104 - 1109, XP007905969 [X] 3,4,50,51,57,80,81,87,122-151 * paragraphs [2.3.1.] - [2.3.3.] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/elps.1150190709 | Examination | WO03060503 |