EP2178738 - A GENERATOR FOR A BICYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reelight APS Hasselager Centervej 11, 1 8260 Viby / DK | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/17] | For all designated states Reelight APS Hasselager Centervej 11, 1 8260 Viby J / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEDERSEN, Troels Ternevej 2 DK-2990 Nivå / DK | [2010/17] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2010/17] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sundkrogsgade 9 P.O. Box 831 2100 Copenhagen / DK | Application number, filing date | 08708505.6 | 31.01.2008 | [2010/17] | WO2008EP51194 | Priority number, date | DK20070001103 | 30.07.2007 Original published format: DK 200701103 | [2010/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009015910 | Date: | 05.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2178738 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2178738 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B62J6/06 | [2010/17] | CPC: |
B62J6/06 (EP,US);
B62J6/20 (EP,US);
H02K21/24 (EP,US);
H02K7/11 (EP,US);
H02K7/1846 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/17] | Title | German: | FAHRRADDYNAMO | [2010/17] | English: | A GENERATOR FOR A BICYCLE | [2010/17] | French: | GENERATEUR POUR BICYCLETTE | [2010/45] |
Former [2010/17] | GÉNÉRATEUR POUR BICYCLETTE | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/17] | 18.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.01.2008 | AT | 06.04.2011 | CY | 06.04.2011 | CZ | 06.04.2011 | EE | 06.04.2011 | FI | 06.04.2011 | HR | 06.04.2011 | IT | 06.04.2011 | LT | 06.04.2011 | LV | 06.04.2011 | MT | 06.04.2011 | PL | 06.04.2011 | RO | 06.04.2011 | SI | 06.04.2011 | SK | 06.04.2011 | TR | 06.04.2011 | BG | 06.07.2011 | NO | 06.07.2011 | GR | 07.07.2011 | ES | 17.07.2011 | IS | 06.08.2011 | PT | 08.08.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/32] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
IT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
MT | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
TR | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
MT | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
TR | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
MT | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 06.04.2011 | |
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | SI | 06.04.2011 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO0133700 (RELIGHT [DK], et al) [AD] 1,1,1 * page 10, lines 4-17; figure 10; claim - * * page 10, lines 4-17; figure 10; claim - * * page 10, lines 4-17; figure 10; claim - *; | [AD]WO2004068681 (GANG QIN [GB]) [AD] 1,1,1 * figure -; claim - * * figure -; claim - ** figure -; claim - *; | [A]WO2005075284 (VUELTA INTERNAT S P A [IT], et al) [A] 1,1,1 * figure -; claim - * * figure -; claim - * * figure -; claim - * | by applicant | WO0133700 | WO2004068681 |