EP2121847 - AGE RESISTANT BITUMINOUS COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 06.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2022 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOTAL MARKETING SERVICES 24, Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | [2013/36] |
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states TOTAL RAFFINAGE MARKETING Tour Total 24 Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIN, Didier 1079 route de St Vincent F-69440 St Laurent d'Agny / FR | 02 /
RIVIER, Céline 11 bis rue Léon Monnet F-38550 Sablons / FR | 03 /
MENDEZ, Stéphanie 71 boulevard Eugène Réguillon F-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/23] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2018/14] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2009/48] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2009/40] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52 Rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08708762.3 | 07.02.2008 | [2009/48] | WO2008EP51474 | Priority number, date | FR20070001076 | 14.02.2007 Original published format: FR 0701076 | [2009/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008101809 | Date: | 28.08.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2121847 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2121847 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/14] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2121847 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08L95/00, C08L23/00, E01C7/18, E04B1/66, C08L91/06, C08L91/08, C08L23/02 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
E01C7/18 (EP);
C08L95/00 (EP);
C08L23/02 (EP);
C08L91/08 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L95/00, C08L2666/06 (EP);
C08L95/00, C08L91/06 (EP) |
Former IPC [2009/48] | C08L95/00, C08L23/00, E01C7/18, E04B1/66 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/14] |
Former [2009/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ALTERUNGSRESISTENTE BITUMENZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2009/48] | English: | AGE RESISTANT BITUMINOUS COMPOSITION | [2009/48] | French: | COMPOSITION BITUMINEUSE RESISTANTE AU VIEILLISSEMENT | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 02.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.01.2019
ADMISSIBLE Sasol Wax GmbH Worthdamm 13-27 20457 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB (Muc) Schellerdamm 19 21079 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.01.2019
ADMISSIBLE Sasol Wax GmbH Worthdamm 13-27 20457 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Schellerdamm 19 21079 Hamburg / DE | 17.01.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.05.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 16.03.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.03.2020 | 17.03.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.02.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.03.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 14.12.2021 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.03.2022 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 28.04.2022 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 24.02.2022 | Appeal received No. T0524/22 | 24.02.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 11.03.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.02.2008 | AT | 04.04.2018 | CY | 04.04.2018 | CZ | 04.04.2018 | DK | 04.04.2018 | EE | 04.04.2018 | ES | 04.04.2018 | FI | 04.04.2018 | HR | 04.04.2018 | IT | 04.04.2018 | LT | 04.04.2018 | LV | 04.04.2018 | MC | 04.04.2018 | MT | 04.04.2018 | NL | 04.04.2018 | PL | 04.04.2018 | RO | 04.04.2018 | SE | 04.04.2018 | SI | 04.04.2018 | SK | 04.04.2018 | TR | 04.04.2018 | BG | 04.07.2018 | NO | 04.07.2018 | GR | 05.07.2018 | IS | 04.08.2018 | PT | 06.08.2018 | IE | 07.02.2019 | LU | 07.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/31] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CY | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
MT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
TR | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
IS | 04.08.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
IE | 07.02.2019 | ||
LU | 07.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CY | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
MT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
TR | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
IE | 07.02.2019 | ||
LU | 07.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
MT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
TR | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
IE | 07.02.2019 | ||
LU | 07.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
TR | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
IE | 07.02.2019 | ||
LU | 07.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
IE | 07.02.2019 | ||
LU | 07.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
LU | 07.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
LU | 07.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 04.04.2018 | |
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | ES | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 04.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6027557 (HAYNER ROGER E [US]) [X] 1-24 * claims 1-20 *; | [X]WO03095749 (WILDER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY [US], et al) [X] 1-24 * page 11, columns 1-3 ** page 12, line 1 *; | [X] - GRAHAM C. HURLEY AND BRIAN D. POWELL, "Evaluation of Sasobit for use in warm mix asphalt", Auburn, AL 36830 USA, (200506), pages 1 - 27, URL: http://www.eng.auburn.edu/center/ncat/reports/rep05-06.pdf, (20070919), XP002451497 [X] 1-24 * the whole document * | [PA] - SASOL WAX GMBH WORTHDAMM 13-27 20457 HAMBURG GERMANY, "What is Sasobit?", (2007), page 1, URL: http://www.sasolwax.com/Europe-highlight-sasobit.html, (20070919), XP002451498 [PA] 1-24 * the whole document * | Opposition | EP1254925 | - YLVA EDWARDS et al., "Rheological effects of commercial waxes and polyphosphoric acid in bitumen 160/220-low temperature performance", Fuel, (20051024), vol. 85, no. 7-8, pages 989 - 997, XP005234198 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fuel.2005.09.014 | - "Standard Method of Test for Effect of Heat and Air on a Moving Film of Asphalt Binder (Rolling Thin-Film Oven Test) , AASHTO T 240", AASHTO Designation, (20130000), pages 1 - 11, XP055547151 | - "Standard Test Method for Effect of Heat and Air on a Moving Film of Asphalt Binder (Rolling Thin-Film Oven Test) , ASTM D 2872", Designation ASTM D2872, (20180000), pages 1 - 5, XP055547158 | - "Evaluation of Strategic Highway Research Program (SHRP) Products for Application to Air-port Pavements", SHRP specifications for RTFOT and PAV, (20001000), pages 1 - 236, XP055547166 | - "Bitumen und bitumenhaltige Bindemittel - Bestimmung der Bestandigkeit gegen Verhartung unter Einfluss von Warme und Luft - Teil 1: RTFOT-Verfahren", DIN EN 12607-1, (20150100), pages 1 - 17, XP055547175 | - "Bitumen und bitumenhaltige Bindemittel - Beschleunigte Langzeit-Alterung mit einem Druckalterungsbehalter (PAV)", DIN EN 14769, (20120800), pages 1 - 14, XP055547180 | - "Standard Practice for Accelerated Aging of Asphalt Binder Using a Pressurized Aging Vessel (PAV)", Designation ASTM D 6251, (20180000), pages 1 - 6, XP055547184 | - YLVA EDWARDS et al., "Influence of Commercial Waxes on Bitumen Aging Properties", Energy & Fules, (20050914), vol. 19, pages 2519 - 2525, XP055547188 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/efD50166r | - FRANCIS MIGLIORI et al., "Comparative Study of RTFOT and PAV Aging Simulation Laboratory Tests", Transportation Research Record, (19980000), vol. 1638, no. 98-0850, pages 56 - 63, XP055547194 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3141/1638-07 | - "Was ist Sasobit@?", http:/Isasolwax.comlEuropa-lang-de.html from, (20070919), XP002451498 | - GRAHAM C. HURLEY et al., "EVALUATION OF SASOBIT® FOR USE IN WARM MIX ASPHALT", NCAT Report 05-06, (20050600), pages 1 - 32, XP055547202 | - K.-W. DAMM et al., "Asphalt Flow improvers as intelligent Asphalt flow improvers as 'intelligent fill- ers' for hot asphalts - A new chapter in asphalt technology", Journal of Applied Asphalt Binder Technology, (20020400), vol. 2, no. 1, ISSN 1534-5793, pages 36 - 69, XP055547206 | - W. FUHRMANN, "bitumen und asphalt taschenbuch", BAUVERLAG GMBH, (19690000), pages 24 - 27, XP055547211 | - "Bitumen und bitumenhaltige Bindemittel - Bestimmung des Erweichungspunktes - Ring- und Kugel-Verfahren", DIN EN 1427, (20150900), pages 1 - 21, XP055547214 |