Designated contracting states | AT | | BE | | BG | Lapse: 09.07.2014 | CH | | CY | Lapse: 09.04.2014 | CZ | | DE | | DK | | EE | Lapse: 09.04.2014 | ES | | FI | | FR | | GB | | GR | | HR | | HU | Lapse: 15.02.2008 | IE | | IS | Lapse: 09.08.2014 | IT | | LI | | LT | Lapse: 09.04.2014 | LU | | LV | Lapse: 09.04.2014 | MC | Lapse: 09.04.2014 | MT | Lapse: 09.04.2014 | NL | | NO | | PL | | PT | | RO | Lapse: 09.04.2014 | SE | | SI | Lapse: 09.04.2014 | SK | Lapse: 09.04.2014 | TR | | Examination procedure | 28.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | | 21.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | | 21.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | European patent granted | 09.04.2014 | Opposition procedure | 12.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.03.2015 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 11.11.2009 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20090821 | | Event date: | 11.11.2009 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 02.06.2010 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20100430 | | Event date: | 09.06.2010 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED) | | Event date: | 16.01.2013 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | RB PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED | | Event date: | 25.12.2013 | | Event description: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED | Effective DATE: | 20131127 | | Event date: | 09.04.2014 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 09.04.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Event date: | 15.04.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT REF 660961 AT T | Code Expl.: | +REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA) | Effective DATE: | 20140415 | | Event date: | 15.04.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Event date: | 22.05.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R096 602008031380 DE | Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT | Effective DATE: | 20140522 | | Event date: | 21.05.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Event date: | 13.06.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH NV | Code Expl.: | NEW AGENT | REPRESENTATIVE: | FIAMMENGHI-FIAMMENGHI, CH | | Event date: | 30.06.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK T3 | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS | Effective DATE: | 20140627 | | Event date: | 09.07.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL T3 | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION FILED FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995 | | Event date: | 15.07.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2476865 ES T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20140715 | | Event date: | 22.07.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE TRGR | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT | | Event date: | 15.07.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PT SC4A | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE | Free Format Text: | AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION | Effective DATE: | 20140701 | | Event date: | 15.09.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NO T2 | Code Expl.: | +ENTRY OF EP PATENT INTO NATIONAL PHASE OF NORWAY [PUBL. OF TRANSLATION] | Effective DATE: | 20140409 | | Event date: | 25.09.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LT MG4D | Code Expl.: | -INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT | | Event date: | 30.09.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PL T3 | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT | | Event date: | 31.10.2014 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IS | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20140809 | | Event date: | 31.10.2014 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20140709 | | Event date: | 31.10.2014 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20140409 | | Event date: | 28.11.2014 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LV | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20140409 | | Event date: | 30.01.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20140409 | | Event date: | 30.01.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20140409 | | Event date: | 30.01.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20140409 | | Event date: | 18.03.2015 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20150112 | | Event date: | 12.01.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R097 602008031380 DE | Code Expl.: | +NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION | | Event date: | 23.04.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R097 602008031380 DE | Code Expl.: | +NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION | Effective DATE: | 20150112 | | Event date: | 31.07.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20140409 | | Event date: | 30.09.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20150215 | | Event date: | 30.10.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20140409 | | Event date: | 15.02.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PFA | Code Expl.: | NAME/FIRM CHANGED | OWNER: | INDIVIOR UK LIMITED, GB | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: RB PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED, GB | | Event date: | 17.02.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 602008031380 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | WITTMANN HERNANDEZ PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAF, DE | | Event date: | 17.02.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 9 | | Event date: | 17.02.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 602008031380 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | INDIVIOR UK LIMITED, GB | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: RB PHARMACEUTICALS LTD., SLOUGH, BERKSHIRE, GB | | Event date: | 23.10.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GR EP 20140401322 GR | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE | Effective DATE: | 20140901 | | Event date: | 18.03.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR CD | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME | OWNER: | INDIVIOR UK LIMITED, GB | Effective DATE: | 20160211 | | Event date: | 18.04.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NO CHAD | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF THE OWNER'S NAME OR ADDRESS (PAR. 44 PATENT LAW, PAR. PATENTFORSKRIFTEN) | OWNER: | INDIVIOR UK LIMITED, GB | | Event date: | 29.04.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Payment DATE: | 20160226 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 29.04.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20160226 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 29.04.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20160225 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 29.04.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NO | Payment DATE: | 20160226 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 29.04.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Payment DATE: | 20160127 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 29.04.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Payment DATE: | 20160125 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 29.04.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20160226 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 29.04.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20160226 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 29.04.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Payment DATE: | 20160224 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 29.04.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20160223 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 15.05.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT HC 660961 AT T | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS | OWNER: | INDIVIOR UK LIMITED, GB | Effective DATE: | 20160411 | | Event date: | 31.05.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20160120 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 31.05.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Payment DATE: | 20160226 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 31.05.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Payment DATE: | 20160121 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 31.05.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 20160226 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 31.05.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20160217 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 31.05.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HR | Payment DATE: | 20160127 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 31.05.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Payment DATE: | 20160226 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 31.05.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PL | Payment DATE: | 20160127 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 31.05.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20160226 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 31.05.2016 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20160226 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Event date: | 17.02.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 602008031380 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | INDIVIOR UK LIMITED, SLOUGH, GB | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: RB PHARMACEUTICALS LTD., SLOUGH, BERKSHIRE, GB | | Event date: | 17.02.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 602008031380 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | HERNANDEZ, YORCK, DIPL.-ING., DE | | Event date: | 29.05.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 602008031380 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | HERNANDEZ, YORCK, DIPL.-ING., DE | | Event date: | 25.05.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL HC | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF NAME(S) OF PROPRIETOR(S) | OWNER: | INDIVIOR UK LIMITED; GB | Free Format Text: | DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: VERANDERING VAN EIGENAAR(S), VERANDERING VAN NAAM VAN DE EIGENAAR(S); FORMER OWNER NAME: RB PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED | Effective DATE: | 20160201 | | Event date: | 30.12.2016 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20140409 | | Event date: | 31.05.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT; INVALID AB INITIO | Effective DATE: | 20080215 | | Event date: | 31.05.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170228 | | Event date: | 30.06.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20140409 | | Event date: | 18.09.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK EBP | Code Expl.: | -EP PATENT LAPSED | Effective DATE: | 20170228 | | Event date: | 25.09.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NO MMEP | Code Expl.: | -LAPSED, NULLIFIED, VOID OR EXPIRED EUROPEAN PATENT THAT HAD EFFECT IN NORWAY | | Event date: | 03.10.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE EUG | Code Expl.: | -EP PATENT HAS LAPSED | | Event date: | 29.09.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Event date: | 04.10.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL MM | Code Expl.: | -LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20170301 | | Event date: | 15.10.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT MM01 660961 AT T | Code Expl.: | -LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170215 | | Event date: | 01.09.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R119 602008031380 DE | Code Expl.: | -APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | | Event date: | 25.10.2017 | | Event description: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20170215 | | Event date: | 31.10.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170228 | | Event date: | 31.10.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170228 | | Event date: | 31.10.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170906 | | Event date: | 31.10.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170215 | | Event date: | 31.10.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170215 | | Event date: | 31.10.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170215 | | Event date: | 31.10.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170215 | | Event date: | 31.10.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NO | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170228 | | Event date: | 30.11.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170216 | | Event date: | 30.11.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170301 | | Event date: | 30.11.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170816 | | Event date: | 01.12.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | Effective DATE: | 20171031 | | Event date: | 29.11.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE MM4A | Code Expl.: | -PATENT LAPSED | | Event date: | 31.01.2018 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170901 | | Event date: | 31.01.2018 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170228 | | Event date: | 31.01.2018 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170228 | | Event date: | 28.02.2018 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170215 | | Event date: | 28.02.2018 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170215 | | Event date: | 28.02.2018 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170215 | | Event date: | 05.07.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FD2A | Code Expl.: | -ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN | Effective DATE: | 20180705 | | Event date: | 31.07.2018 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170216 | | Event date: | 31.08.2018 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170215 | | Event date: | 22.02.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG BE HC | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF NAME OF THE OWNERS | OWNER: | INDIVIOR UK LIMITED; GB | Free Format Text: | DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: CHANGE OF OWNER(S), CHANGEMENT NOM PROPRIETAIRE; FORMER OWNER NAME: RB PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED | Effective DATE: | 20160211 | | Event date: | 22.02.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG BE MM | Code Expl.: | -LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20170228 | | Event date: | 04.09.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR PBON P20140591 HR | Code Expl.: | -LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20170215 | | Event date: | 27.01.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR ODRP P20140591 HR | Code Expl.: | +RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT | Payment DATE: | 20160127 | Year of Fee Payment: | 9 | | Event date: | 30.03.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR PNAN P20140591 HR | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF THE APPLICANT NAME, ADDRESS/RESIDENCE | OWNER: | INDIVIOR UK LIMITED, GB | | Event date: | 12.09.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR T1PR P20140591 HR | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALIDATED IN CROATIA | | Event date: | 24.06.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR TUEP P20140591 HR | Code Expl.: | REQUEST FOR EP VALIDATION RECEIVED | | Event date: | 07.03.2014 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 04.02.2014 | | Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Event date: | 26.11.2013 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 09.10.2009 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 13.02.2015 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Event date: | 13.02.2015 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | | Event date: | 30.06.2022 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170215 | |