EP2122336 - METHOD AND COMPOSITION FOR SURFACE COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dredge, Dean William 3 Lark Close Stowmarket Suffolk IP14 5QW / GB | For all designated states Knight, Shaun Barry Maple Cottage Marsh Lane New Buckenham Norwich NR16 2BE / GB | [2009/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Goodman, Simon John Nye Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Goodman, Simon John Nye Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 08709460.3 | 19.02.2008 | [2009/48] | WO2008GB00574 | Priority number, date | GB20070003319 | 21.02.2007 Original published format: GB 0703319 | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008102126 | Date: | 28.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2122336 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/88, B62D65/00 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
B62D65/005 (EP,US);
G01N21/8803 (EP,GB,US);
G01N21/91 (EP,GB,US);
B05D1/02 (GB);
B05D2202/00 (GB);
B05D2203/20 (GB);
B05D2203/30 (GB);
B05D2203/35 (GB);
B05D2210/00 (GB);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR OBERFLÄCHENBESCHICHTUNG | [2009/48] | English: | METHOD AND COMPOSITION FOR SURFACE COATING | [2009/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET COMPOSITION DE REVÊTEMENT DE SURFACE | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 12.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/08] | 10.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.01.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]GB1091958 (GUNSONS SORTEX LTD); | [A]NL7810905 (SKF IND TRADING & DEV); | [A]JPS60113134 (SAPPORO BREWERIES); | [A]WO8605588 (DIFFRACTO LTD [CA], et al); | [A]US4920385 (CLARKE DONALD A [CA], et al); | [DA]WO9404617 (HENKEL CORP [US]); | [X]GB2295890 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [DA]JP2005257512 (NEOS KK, et al) | by applicant | GB1091958 | WO9404617 | GB2295890 | WO0142369 | JP2005257512 |