EP2134948 - INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE EXHAUST GAS SYSTEM AND CONTROL METHOD OF THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2012/44] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2009/52] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMADA, Takafumi c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha of 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
OHKI, Hisashi c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2012/44] |
Former [2009/52] | 01 /
YAMADA, Takafumi c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha of 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | ||
02 /
OHKI, Hisashi c/o ToyotaJidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2009/52] | Intes, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08709889.3 | 19.02.2008 | [2009/52] | WO2008IB00529 | Priority number, date | JP20070043415 | 23.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007043415 | [2009/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008102260 | Date: | 28.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2134948 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2134948 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/02, F01N3/025, F02D21/08, F02M25/07 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
F02D41/0055 (EP,US);
F01N13/0097 (EP,US);
F01N3/0253 (EP,US);
F01N3/106 (EP,US);
F01N9/002 (EP,US);
F01N9/005 (EP,US);
F02D41/0007 (EP,US);
F02D41/18 (EP,US);
F01N2560/025 (EP,US);
F01N2560/06 (EP,US);
F01N2560/14 (EP,US);
F01N2900/14 (EP,US);
F01N3/035 (EP,US);
F02B2075/125 (EP,US);
F02B29/0406 (EP,US);
F02B37/00 (EP,US);
F02B37/12 (EP,US);
F02D41/029 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/52] | F02D41/02, F01N3/025 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/52] | Title | German: | VERBRENNUNGSMOTORABGASSYSTEM UND STEUERVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2009/52] | English: | INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE EXHAUST GAS SYSTEM AND CONTROL METHOD OF THE SAME | [2009/52] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT DE MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE CELUI-CI | [2009/52] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 29.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.02.2008 | AT | 31.10.2012 | BE | 31.10.2012 | CY | 31.10.2012 | CZ | 31.10.2012 | DK | 31.10.2012 | EE | 31.10.2012 | FI | 31.10.2012 | HR | 31.10.2012 | IT | 31.10.2012 | LT | 31.10.2012 | LV | 31.10.2012 | MT | 31.10.2012 | NL | 31.10.2012 | PL | 31.10.2012 | RO | 31.10.2012 | SE | 31.10.2012 | SI | 31.10.2012 | SK | 31.10.2012 | TR | 31.10.2012 | BG | 31.01.2013 | NO | 31.01.2013 | GR | 01.02.2013 | ES | 11.02.2013 | GB | 19.02.2013 | IE | 19.02.2013 | LU | 19.02.2013 | CH | 28.02.2013 | IS | 28.02.2013 | LI | 28.02.2013 | MC | 28.02.2013 | PT | 28.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
TR | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
GB | 19.02.2013 | ||
IE | 19.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
MT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
GB | 19.02.2013 | ||
IE | 19.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
GB | 19.02.2013 | ||
IE | 19.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IE | 19.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
HR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LV | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 31.10.2012 | |
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 31.10.2012 | |
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
NO | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 31.10.2012 | |
NO | 31.01.2013 | Cited in | International search | [DA]JP2005069207 (NISSAN MOTOR) [DA] 1,13 * abstract *; | [A]EP1132583 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [A] 1,13 * paragraphs [0022] - [0029] *; | [DA]JP2001234772 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [DA] 1,13 * abstract * |