Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2109972
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
01.07.2011 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] |
29.03.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
17.03.2011 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
29.10.2010 |
Change - representative |
published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] |
20.09.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.04.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 19.05.2010 [2010/20] |
23.03.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.02.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.11.2009 |
First examination report |
|
25.11.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.09.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] |
18.09.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] |
17.09.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.09.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.08.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.08.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.08.2009 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.09.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.08.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.03.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|