EP2109972 - SHARED CONTROL CHANNEL DATA-ASSISTED CHANNEL ESTIMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2009/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREDERIKSEN, Frank Hornbaekvej 4 DK-9270 Klarup / DK | 02 /
MOGENSEN, Preben, E. Elmelunden 13 DK-9260 Gistrup / DK | 03 /
NIELSEN, Anders, Ostergaard Vesterbrogade 196, 3.th DK-1800 Frederiksberg C / DK | 04 /
HOJEN-SORENSEN, Pedro Brombaervej 14 DK-3450 Allerod / DK | [2009/43] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Rights P.O. Box 226 00045 Nokia Group / FI | ||
Former [2009/43] | Harper, Claire Nokia UK Limited IPR Department 2-6 Boundary Row Southwark Greater London SE1 8HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 08710007.9 | 12.02.2008 | [2009/43] | WO2008IB50506 | Priority number, date | US20070901620P | 12.02.2007 Original published format: US 901620 P | [2009/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008099342 | Date: | 21.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2109972 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/02 | [2009/43] | CPC: |
H04L25/0236 (EP,US);
H04L27/2647 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/43] | Title | German: | DATENUNTERSTÜTZTE KANALSCHÄTZUNG MIT GEMEINSAMEM STEUERKANAL | [2009/43] | English: | SHARED CONTROL CHANNEL DATA-ASSISTED CHANNEL ESTIMATION | [2009/43] | French: | ESTIMATION DE CANAL ASSISTÉE PAR DES DONNÉES D'UN CANAL DE COMMANDE PARTAGÉ | [2009/43] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/43] | 30.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/31] | 21.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.11.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6304624 (SEKI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-31 * the whole document *; | [A]US6483821 (DABAK ANAND G [US], et al) [A] 1-31* the whole document *; | [X]US2002191578 (BACHL RAINER [DE], et al) [X] 1-31 * paragraphs [0059] - [0062] *; | [A]US2004071193 (ATARASHI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-31 * claims 30-33 *; | [X]US2005152478 (JALLOUL LOUAY [US], et al) [X] 1-31 * paragraphs [0036] - [0044] *; | [A]US2007030827 (RUI WANG R [CA], et al) [A] 1-31 * claim 1 *; | [X] - VITTORIA MIGNONE ET AL, "CD3-OFDM: A Novel Demodulation Scheme for Fixed and Mobile Receivers", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19960901), vol. 44, no. 9, ISSN 0090-6778, XP011008784 [X] 1-31 * " Chapter III.B * | by applicant | US2002191578 |