EP2128650 - DOSIMETER HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2018 [2018/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Precision Inc. 1-1 Akanehama 1-chome Narashino-shi Chiba 275-8558 / JP | For all designated states Chiyoda Technol Corporation 1-7-12, Yushima Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8681 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | For all designated states Seiko Precision Inc. 1-1 Akanehama 1-chome Narashino-shi Chiba 275-8558 / JP | ||
For all designated states Chiyoda Technol Corporation 1-7-12, Yushima Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8681 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Hideki c/o SEIKO PRECISION INC. 1-1 Akanehama 1-chome Narashino-shi Chiba 275-8558 / JP | 02 /
MADA, Kazuyuki c/o Tochigi Unit, Seiko Precision Inc. 1864, Ienaka Tsuga-machi Shimotsuga-gun Tochigi 328-0111 / JP | 03 /
KAWAI, Megumi c/o Tochigi Unit, Seiko Precision Inc. 1864, Ienaka Tsuga-machi Shimotsuga-gun Tochigi 328-0111 / JP | 04 /
HIRANO, Yasuhiro c/o Chiyoda Technol Corporation 7-12, Yushima 1-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8681 / JP | 05 /
JUTO, Norimichi c/o Oarai Research Center Chiyoda Technol Corporation 3681, Narita-cho, Oarai-machi Higashi-ibaraki-gun Ibaraki 311-1313 / JP | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Intes, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08710556.5 | 18.01.2008 | [2009/49] | WO2008JP50566 | Priority number, date | JP20070013078 | 23.01.2007 Original published format: JP 2007013078 | [2009/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008090808 | Date: | 31.07.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2128650 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/06, G01T1/00, G01T7/00 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
G01T1/20 (EP);
G01T1/10 (EP);
G01T1/202 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | DOSIMETERGEHÄUSE | [2009/49] | English: | DOSIMETER HOUSING | [2009/49] | French: | BOÎTIER POUR DOSIMÈTRE | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2009 | Translation filed | 21.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 21.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 18.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/03] | 07.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.01.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2763786 (MAUER PAUL B, et al) [A] 3 * column 1, line 67 - line 69 ** figure 2 *; | [X]US3100262 (BENJAMIN SHENKER, et al) [X] 1-4 * column 1, line 61 - line 67 * * column 1, line 70 - column 2, line 9 * * column 2, line 8 - line 9 * * column 3, line 32 - line 34 * * figure 2 * * figure 5 *; | [X]JPH1123717 (TOSHIBA GLASS KK) [X] 1,2,4 * paragraph [0024] * * figure 2 *; | [X]JP2000098036 (ASAHI TECHNO GLASS CORP) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0012] * * figure 10 * | International search | [A]JPS4411513Y ; | [A]JPH1164524 (TOSHIBA GLASS KK); | [A]JP2000098036 (ASAHI TECHNO GLASS CORP); | [A]JPH052077 (TOSHIBA GLASS KK); | [A]JP2002040140 (NIPPON KUCHO SERVICE KK) | Examination | US4975589 | by applicant | JP2583765B | JP2005121453 | JP2006125958 |