EP2116310 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING LENS HAVING COATED LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR Updated state(s): MT | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokuyama Corporation 1-1 Mikage-cho Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 745-8648 / JP | [2009/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Naoto c/o Tokuyama Corporation 1-1 Mikage-cho Shunan-shi Yamaguchi 745-8648 / JP | 02 /
MORI, Katsuhiro c/o Tokuyama Corporation 1-1 Mikage-cho Shunan-shi Yamaguchi 745-8648 / JP | 03 /
FUKADA, Noriyuki c/o Tokuyama Corporation 1-1 Mikage-cho Shunan-shi Yamaguchi 745-8648 / JP | [2015/21] |
Former [2009/46] | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Naoto c/o Tokuyama Corporation 1-1 Mikage-cho Shunan-shi Yamaguchi 745-8648 / JP | ||
02 /
MORI, Katsuhiro c/o Tokuyama Corporation 1-1 Mikage-cho Shunan-shi Yamaguchi 745-8648 / JP | |||
03 /
FUKADA, Noriyuki c/o Tokuyama Corporation 1-1 Mikage-cho Shunan-shi Yamaguchi 745-8648 / JP | Representative(s) | Duckworth, Timothy John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2015/21] |
Former [2009/46] | Duckworth, Timothy John J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08710586.2 | 25.01.2008 | [2009/46] | WO2008JP51085 | Priority number, date | JP20070024092 | 02.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007024092 | [2009/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008093613 | Date: | 07.08.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2116310 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2116310 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B05D1/28, B05D7/00, B05D7/24, G02B5/23 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
B05D1/005 (EP,US);
B05D3/067 (EP,US);
B05D5/061 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/21] |
Former [2009/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON LINSEN MIT EINER ÜBERZUGSSCHICHT | [2009/46] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING LENS HAVING COATED LAYER | [2009/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE LENTILLE AYANT UNE COUCHE REVÊTUE | [2009/46] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2009 | Translation filed | 06.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 06.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 06.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.01.2008 | AT | 20.05.2015 | BE | 20.05.2015 | CY | 20.05.2015 | CZ | 20.05.2015 | DK | 20.05.2015 | EE | 20.05.2015 | FI | 20.05.2015 | HR | 20.05.2015 | LT | 20.05.2015 | LV | 20.05.2015 | MC | 20.05.2015 | NL | 20.05.2015 | PL | 20.05.2015 | RO | 20.05.2015 | SE | 20.05.2015 | SI | 20.05.2015 | SK | 20.05.2015 | TR | 20.05.2015 | BG | 20.08.2015 | NO | 20.08.2015 | GR | 21.08.2015 | IS | 20.09.2015 | PT | 21.09.2015 | IE | 25.01.2016 | LU | 25.01.2016 | CH | 31.01.2016 | LI | 31.01.2016 | MT | 31.01.2016 | [2018/31] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 25.01.2008 | |
AT | 20.05.2015 | ||
BE | 20.05.2015 | ||
CY | 20.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
MT | 20.05.2015 | ||
NL | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SE | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.01.2016 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
BE | 20.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
MT | 20.05.2015 | ||
NL | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SE | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.01.2016 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
BE | 20.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.01.2016 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
BE | 20.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
BE | 20.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
MC | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
BE | 20.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
LU | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
BE | 20.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SI | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
CZ | 20.05.2015 | ||
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
PL | 20.05.2015 | ||
RO | 20.05.2015 | ||
SK | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
EE | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
DK | 20.05.2015 | ||
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 20.05.2015 | |
FI | 20.05.2015 | ||
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 20.05.2015 | |
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
BG | 20.08.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
IS | 20.09.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 20.05.2015 | |
HR | 20.05.2015 | ||
LT | 20.05.2015 | ||
LV | 20.05.2015 | ||
NO | 20.08.2015 | ||
GR | 21.08.2015 | ||
PT | 21.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1609538 (TOKUYAMA CORP [JP]) [X] 1,5 * paragraph [0046]; claims 1,2,3,6 * [I] 2-4,6; | [E]EP2149400 (TOKUYAMA CORP [JP]) [E] 1 * paragraph [0055] *; | [E]EP1947484 (TOKUYAMA CORP [JP]) [E] 1,5 * claims 1,8,12 *; | [XP]WO2007052815 (TOKUYAMA CORP [JP], et al) [XP] 1; | [AD]JP2005013873 (TOKUYAMA CORP) [AD] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]JP2005013873 (TOKUYAMA CORP); | [A]JP2005246268 (HOYA CORP); | [A]JP2005246267 (HOYA CORP); | [A]JP2005343119 (SDC TECHNOLOGIES ASIA KK) |