EP2123661 - CHIRAL IRIDIUM AQUA COMPLEX AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING OPTICALLY ACTIVE HYDROXY COMPOUND BY USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | For all designated states Carreira, Erick M. Laboratory of Organic Chemistry ETH-Hoenggerberg Zurich / CH | [2009/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARREIRA, Erick M. c/o Laboratory of Organic Chemistry ETH-Hoenggerberg Zurich / CH | [2013/21] |
Former [2009/48] | 01 /
CARREIRA, Erick M. c/o Laboratory of Organic Chemistry ETH-Hoenggerberg Zurich / CH | Representative(s) | Duckworth, Timothy John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2013/21] |
Former [2009/50] | Duckworth, Timothy John J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/48] | Duckworth, Timothy John J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08710614.2 | 29.01.2008 | [2009/48] | WO2008JP51287 | Priority number, date | JP20070017670 | 29.01.2007 Original published format: JP 2007017670 | [2009/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008093668 | Date: | 07.08.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2123661 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2123661 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07F17/02, C07C51/367, C07C59/48, C07C201/12, C07C205/16, C07C205/32, C07C253/30, C07C255/36, C07F15/00, C07B53/00, C07B61/00 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
C07F17/02 (EP,US);
C07F15/00 (KR);
C07B53/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07C205/16 (EP,US);
C07C205/26 (EP,US);
C07C205/32 (EP,US);
C07C253/30 (EP,US);
C07C51/367 (KR);
C07C59/48 (KR);
C07B2200/07 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C253/30, C07C255/36 (EP,US);
C07C253/30, C07C255/37 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Extension states | AL | 26.08.2009 | BA | 26.08.2009 | MK | 26.08.2009 | RS | 26.08.2009 | Title | German: | CHIRALER IRIDIUM-AQUA-KOMPLEX UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER OPTISCH AKTIVEN HYDROXYLVERBINDUNG UNTER ANWENDUNG DAVON | [2009/48] | English: | CHIRAL IRIDIUM AQUA COMPLEX AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING OPTICALLY ACTIVE HYDROXY COMPOUND BY USING THE SAME | [2009/48] | French: | COMPLEXE CHIRAL IRIDIUM AQUA ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE COMPOSÉ HYDROXYLÉ ACTIF SUR LE PLAN OPTIQUE À PARTIR DE CELUI-CI | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2009 | Translation filed | 26.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 21.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.01.2008 | AT | 22.05.2013 | BE | 22.05.2013 | CY | 22.05.2013 | CZ | 22.05.2013 | DK | 22.05.2013 | EE | 22.05.2013 | FI | 22.05.2013 | HR | 22.05.2013 | IT | 22.05.2013 | LT | 22.05.2013 | LV | 22.05.2013 | MC | 22.05.2013 | MT | 22.05.2013 | NL | 22.05.2013 | PL | 22.05.2013 | RO | 22.05.2013 | SE | 22.05.2013 | SI | 22.05.2013 | SK | 22.05.2013 | TR | 22.05.2013 | BG | 22.08.2013 | NO | 22.08.2013 | GR | 23.08.2013 | ES | 02.09.2013 | IS | 22.09.2013 | PT | 23.09.2013 | GB | 29.01.2014 | IE | 29.01.2014 | LU | 29.01.2014 | CH | 31.01.2014 | FR | 31.01.2014 | LI | 31.01.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 29.01.2008 | |
AT | 22.05.2013 | ||
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CY | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
MT | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
GB | 29.01.2014 | ||
IE | 29.01.2014 | ||
LU | 29.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
FR | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CY | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
MT | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
GB | 29.01.2014 | ||
IE | 29.01.2014 | ||
LU | 29.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
FR | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
MT | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
GB | 29.01.2014 | ||
IE | 29.01.2014 | ||
LU | 29.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
FR | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
GB | 29.01.2014 | ||
IE | 29.01.2014 | ||
LU | 29.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
FR | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
GB | 29.01.2014 | ||
LU | 29.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
FR | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
LU | 29.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
LU | 29.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 22.05.2013 | |
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH11335385 (TAKASAGO PERFUMERY CO LTD); | [A]JP2003286294 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [AP]WO2007032409 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY [JP], et al) | [Y] - POTH T. ET AL., "Kinetics and Mechanism of Water Substitution at Half-Sandwich Iridium(III) Aqua Cations Cp*Ir(A-B)(H2O)2+/+ in Aqueous Solution (Cp+ = eta5-Pentamethylcyclopentadienyl Anion; A-B = Bidentate N,N or N,O Ligand)", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (2001), no. 5, pages 1361 - 1369, XP008115953 | [Y] - ABURA T. ET AL., "Isolation and Crystal Structure of a Water-Soluble Iridium Hydride: A Robust and Highly Active Catalyst for Acid-Catalyzed Transfer Hydrogenations of Carbonyl Compounds in Acidic Media", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (2003), vol. 125, no. 14, pages 4149 - 4154, XP008115958 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja0288237 | [A] - MCFARLAND J.M. ET AL., "Reductive Alkylation of Proteins Using Iridium Catalyzed Transfer Hydrogenation", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (2005), vol. 127, no. 39, pages 13490 - 13491, XP008115954 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja054686c | by applicant | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2004), vol. 126, pages 3020 - 3021 | - EUR. J. INORG. CHEM., (2001), pages 1361 - 1369 | - ORGANOMETALLICS, (1999), vol. 18, pages 5470 - 5474 |