EP2120373 - RECEIVING DEVICE FOR VISIBLE LIGHT COMMUNICATION, AND VISIBLE LIGHT COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2009/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshiyuki Sato Intellectual Property Division 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08710661.3 | 31.01.2008 | [2009/47] | WO2008JP51551 | Priority number, date | JP20070063809 | 13.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007063809 | [2009/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008111337 | Date: | 18.09.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2120373 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/54, H04B10/116 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
H04B10/116 (EP,KR,US);
H04B10/1149 (EP,US);
H04B10/60 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2009/47] | H04B10/10, H04B3/54, H04B10/105, H04B10/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | EMPFANGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR DIE KOMMUNIKATION MIT SICHTBAREM LICHT UND SYSTEM ZUR KOMMUNIKATION MIT SICHTBAREM LICHT | [2009/47] | English: | RECEIVING DEVICE FOR VISIBLE LIGHT COMMUNICATION, AND VISIBLE LIGHT COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2009/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉCEPTION POUR UNE COMMUNICATION PAR LUMIÈRE VISIBLE ET SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION PAR LUMIÈRE VISIBLE | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2009 | Translation filed | 08.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 18.03.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004101312 (CABRERA FLORENCIO [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0093] ** figures 1,2 * | International search | [A]JPH0458627 (CANON KK) [A] 1-10* , Full text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH0856183 (IKEGAMI TSUSHINKI KK) [Y] 1-10 * , Par. Nos. [0016] to [0038]; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2004120101 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-10 * , Full text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2004173138 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 6 * , Full text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2004221946 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL) [A] 1-10 * , Full text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2004282389 (GLOBAL COM KK) [A] 1-10 * , Full text; all drawings & US 2006/0056855 A1 & EP 001564914 A1 & WO 2004/038962 A1 & KR 10-2005-0071617 A *; | [A]JP2004363822 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL) [A] 1-10 * , Full text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2004363827 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL) [A] 1-10 * , Full text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2005236667 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [Y] 1-10 * , Full text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2006074323 (AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC) [A] 1-10 * , Full text; all drawings & US 2006/0044652 A1 & EP 001633060 A1 & CN 001744469 A *; | [Y]JP2006174120 (NEC CORP) [Y] 1-10 * , Full text; all drawings (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2003115803 |