EP2249000 - PHASE VARIABLE DEVICE IN CAR ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nittan Valve Co., Ltd. 518 Soya Hadano-shi Kanagawa 257-0031 / JP | [2010/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMEDA, Michihiro c/o NITTAN VALVE CO. LTD. 518 Soya Hadano-shi Kanagawa 257-0031 / JP | 02 /
NAGADOH, Masayasu c/o NITTAN VALVE CO. LTD. 518 Soya Hadano-shi Kanagawa 257-0031 / JP | [2012/40] |
Former [2010/45] | 01 /
KAMEDA, Michihiro c/o NITTAN VALVE CO. LTD. 518 Soya Hadano-shi Kanagawa 257-0031 / JP | ||
02 /
NAGADOH, Masayasu c/o NITTAN VALVE CO. LTD. 518 Soya Hadano-shi Kanagawa 257-0031 / JP | Representative(s) | Klingseisen, Franz Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/40] | Klingseisen, Franz Klingseisen & Partner Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/45] | Klingseisen, Franz Klingseisen & Partner Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08710742.1 | 04.02.2008 | [2010/45] | WO2008JP51763 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009098752 | Date: | 13.08.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2249000 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2249000 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.08.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F01L1/34, F01L1/352, F01L1/344, F01L1/356 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
F01L1/344 (EP,US);
F01L1/352 (EP,US);
F01L1/356 (EP,US);
F01L2001/3522 (EP,US);
F01L2820/031 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/41] | F01L1/34, F01L1/352 | ||
Former IPC [2010/45] | F01L1/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/45] | Title | German: | PHASENVERÄNDERBARE VORRICHTUNG IN EINEM KRAFTFAHRZEUGMOTOR | [2010/45] | English: | PHASE VARIABLE DEVICE IN CAR ENGINE | [2010/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE VARIATION DE PHASE DANS UN MOTEUR D'AUTOMOBILE | [2010/45] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2010 | Translation filed | 21.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/45] | 07.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.02.2008 | AT | 03.10.2012 | BE | 03.10.2012 | CY | 03.10.2012 | CZ | 03.10.2012 | DK | 03.10.2012 | EE | 03.10.2012 | FI | 03.10.2012 | HR | 03.10.2012 | IT | 03.10.2012 | LT | 03.10.2012 | LV | 03.10.2012 | MT | 03.10.2012 | NL | 03.10.2012 | PL | 03.10.2012 | RO | 03.10.2012 | SE | 03.10.2012 | SI | 03.10.2012 | SK | 03.10.2012 | TR | 03.10.2012 | BG | 03.01.2013 | NO | 03.01.2013 | GR | 04.01.2013 | ES | 14.01.2013 | IS | 03.02.2013 | IE | 04.02.2013 | LU | 04.02.2013 | PT | 04.02.2013 | CH | 28.02.2013 | LI | 28.02.2013 | MC | 28.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
MT | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
TR | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
IE | 04.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
MT | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
IE | 04.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
IE | 04.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 03.10.2012 | |
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 03.10.2012 | |
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 03.10.2012 | |
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 03.10.2012 | |
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 03.10.2012 | |
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 03.10.2012 | |
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/11] | SI | 03.10.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004084000 (TAKENAKA AKIHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]US2007209622 (ISOBE EIJI [JP]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]DE102007000279 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]US2005132988 (YAMANAKA ATSUSHI [JP]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH01134011 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US4955330 (FABI CHRISTIAN [CA], et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP3948995B (HITACHI, LTD.); | [A]JP2005113755 (HITACHI UNISIA AUTOMOTIVE LTD); | [A]JP2007071261 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2007071241 (HITACHI LTD) | by applicant | JP3948995B |