EP2115865 - FOREIGN SUBSTANCE REMOVING DEVICE AND FOREIGN SUBSTANCE REMOVING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2009/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHASHI, Kaishi 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2016/46] |
Former [2009/46] | 01 /
OHASHI, Kaishi 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | Williamson, Brian Canon Europe Ltd 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/46] | Williamson, Brian Canon Europe Ltd 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | ||
Former [2009/46] | Williamson, Brian Canon Europe Ltd 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 08710873.4 | 30.01.2008 | [2009/46] | WO2008JP51977 | Priority number, date | JP20070024178 | 02.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007024178 | JP20070314756 | 05.12.2007 Original published format: JP 2007314756 | [2009/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008093884 | Date: | 07.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2115865 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2115865 | Date: | 16.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B06B1/06, B08B7/02, G03B17/02, H04N5/217, H04N5/232, G02B27/00, H02N2/00, // H01L41/04 | [2016/21] | CPC: |
G02B27/0006 (EP,KR,US);
B08B7/02 (EP,KR,US);
G03B17/02 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/65 (EP,US);
H04N23/811 (EP,US);
H10N30/802 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/46] | H02N2/00, B06B1/06, B08B7/02, G03B17/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/46] |
Former [2009/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON FREMDSUBSTANZEN | [2009/46] | English: | FOREIGN SUBSTANCE REMOVING DEVICE AND FOREIGN SUBSTANCE REMOVING METHOD | [2009/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR ENLEVER UNE SUBSTANCE ÉTRANGÈRE | [2016/21] |
Former [2009/46] | DISPOSITIF DE RETRAIT DE SUBSTANCE ÉTRANGÈRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE RETRAIT DE SUBSTANCE ÉTRANGÈRE | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 02.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 17.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16192348.7 / EP3145072 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.01.2008 | AT | 16.11.2016 | BE | 16.11.2016 | CY | 16.11.2016 | CZ | 16.11.2016 | DK | 16.11.2016 | EE | 16.11.2016 | ES | 16.11.2016 | FI | 16.11.2016 | HR | 16.11.2016 | IT | 16.11.2016 | LT | 16.11.2016 | LV | 16.11.2016 | MC | 16.11.2016 | NL | 16.11.2016 | PL | 16.11.2016 | RO | 16.11.2016 | SE | 16.11.2016 | SI | 16.11.2016 | SK | 16.11.2016 | TR | 16.11.2016 | IE | 30.01.2017 | LU | 30.01.2017 | MT | 30.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | FR | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | BG | 16.02.2017 | GB | 16.02.2017 | NO | 16.02.2017 | GR | 17.02.2017 | IS | 16.03.2017 | PT | 16.03.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 30.01.2008 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CY | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
TR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
MT | 30.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
GB | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 30.01.2008 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CY | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
MT | 30.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
GB | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 30.01.2008 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
MT | 30.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
GB | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
MT | 30.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
GB | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
GB | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 16.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US5001404 (KATAOKA KENICHI [JP]); | [XAY]US5130619 (IZUNO YUJI [JP]); | [A]US2004012714 (KAWAI SUMIO [JP]); | [YA]US2004047625 (ITO JUNICHI [JP], et al) | International search | [A]JP2002204379 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [A]JP2003159566 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2005329345 (HONDA ELECTRONIC); | [AP]JP2007193126 (OLYMPUS IMAGING CORP) | by applicant | US5001404 | US5130619 | US2004047625 |