EP2123515 - VEHICLE INTERIOR FINISHING LAMINATE SHEET, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, AND APPARATUS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TS Tech Co., Ltd. 7-27, Sakae-cho 3-chome Asaka-shi, Saitama 351-0012 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states TS Tech Co., Ltd 7-27, Sakae-cho 3-chome Asaka-shi, Saitama 351-0012 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KODAMA, Akira c/o TS TECH CO. LTD. 118-1 Oaza Ota Takanezawa-machi Shioya-gun Tochigi 329-1217 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIDA, Hiroshi c/o TS TECH CO. LTD. 118-1 Oaza Ota Takanezawa-machi Shioya-gun Tochigi 329-1217 / JP | 03 /
SHIMIZU, Takahiro c/o TS TECH CO. LTD. 118-1 Oaza Ota Takanezawa-machi Shioya-gun Tochigi 329-1217 / JP | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08711042.5 | 08.02.2008 | [2009/48] | WO2008JP52163 | Priority number, date | JP20070030265 | 09.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007030265 | JP20070340010 | 28.12.2007 Original published format: JP 2007340010 | JP20070340011 | 28.12.2007 Original published format: JP 2007340011 | [2009/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008096860 | Date: | 14.08.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2123515 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60R13/02, B29C47/14, B29C47/88, B29K23/00, B29K105/04, B29L7/00, B29L31/58 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
B29C44/22 (EP,US);
B29C44/352 (EP,US);
B29C48/07 (EP,US);
B29C48/305 (EP,US);
B29C48/90 (EP,US);
B29C65/1629 (EP,US);
B29C65/1654 (EP,US);
B29C65/1683 (EP,US);
B29C65/2076 (EP,US);
B29C65/7841 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/1142 (EP,US);
B29C66/1162 (EP,US);
B29C66/1282 (EP,US);
B29C66/12841 (EP,US);
B29C66/43 (EP,US);
B29C66/435 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/727 (EP,US);
B29C66/73774 (EP,US);
B29C66/73921 (EP,US);
B29C66/81267 (EP,US);
B29C66/8322 (EP,US);
B29C66/836 (EP,US);
B60R13/02 (EP,US);
B29C65/1674 (EP,US);
B29C66/1248 (EP,US);
B29C66/14 (EP,US);
B29C66/221 (EP,US);
B29C66/7212 (EP,US);
B29C66/73752 (EP,US);
B29K2023/12 (EP,US);
B29K2101/12 (EP,US);
B29K2105/04 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0039 (EP,US);
B29K2995/004 (EP,US);
B29L2031/3005 (EP,US);
B29L2031/3011 (EP,US);
B32B2038/0084 (EP,US);
B32B2305/08 (EP,US);
B32B2607/00 (EP,US);
B32B37/06 (EP,US);
B32B37/08 (EP,US);
B32B37/153 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1376 (EP,US);
Y10T428/161 (EP,US);
Y10T428/163 (EP,US);
Y10T428/17 (EP,US);
Y10T428/19 (EP,US);
Y10T428/192 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24504 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24529 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249953 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249958 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24996 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/10 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/12 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2067/003 (EP,US);
B29C66/7212, B29K2267/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/7212, B29K2307/04 (US,EP);
B29C66/7212, B29K2309/08 (US,EP);
B29C66/7212, B29K2309/14 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | LAMINATFOLIE ZUR INNENAUSKLEIDUNG EINES FAHRZEUGES, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND GERÄT DAFÜR | [2009/48] | English: | VEHICLE INTERIOR FINISHING LAMINATE SHEET, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, AND APPARATUS THEREFOR | [2009/48] | French: | FEUILLE STRATIFIEE DE FINITION D'INTERIEUR DE VEHICULE, SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET APPAREIL POUR CELLE-CI | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2009 | Translation filed | 13.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 13.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 05.02.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS51112018 (ASAHI DOW LTD, et al); | [Y]JPS52121675 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JPS62142092 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]JPH0839710 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JP2003112354 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]JP2004500998 ; | [Y]JP2005515086 | by applicant | JP2005199891 | JP2006045356 |