EP2112688 - SEMICONDUCTOR PACKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2009/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASEGAWA, Tsuyoshi c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/46] |
Former [2009/44] | 01 /
HASEGAWA, Tsuyoshi . . / JP | Representative(s) | Moreland, David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP The Beacon 176 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | Maury, Richard Philip Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08711401.3 | 15.02.2008 | [2009/44] | WO2008JP52571 | Priority number, date | JP20070035356 | 15.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007035356 | [2009/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008099933 | Date: | 21.08.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2112688 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/427 | [2009/44] | CPC: |
H01L23/427 (EP,US);
H01L23/373 (KR);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/44] | Title | German: | HALBLEITERPAKET | [2009/44] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR PACKAGE | [2009/44] | French: | BOÎTIER DE SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2009/44] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2008 | Translation filed | 14.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/44] | 13.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/11] | 02.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5268812 (CONTE ALFRED S [US]) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1296373 (ADVANCED MATERIALS TECH [SG]) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0004] , [0015] , [0027] , [0028]; figures 3,4 *; | [Y]US2004069460 (SASAKI YASUMI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0082] , [0083] , [0085]; figures 1,2,13 *; | [A]US2006096740 (ZHENG WEN-CHUN [US]) [A] 1,5* the whole document * | International search | [Y]JP2003037196 (KYOCERA CORP); | [Y]JP2004028557 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JP2006032798 (FURUKAWA SKY KK) |