EP2113768 - COLUMN OVEN WITH DOUBLE TEMPERATURE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tosoh Corporation 4560, Kaisei-cho Shunan-shi Yamaguchi 746-8501 / JP | [2009/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATOH, Toru 2-2 Rinkan 1-chome, 203 Yamato-shi Kanagawa 242-0003 / JP | 02 /
SUGIMOTO, Tadanori 1-39 Minamidai 2-chome, 401 Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa 228-0814 / JP | 03 /
TAKAHASHI, Minoru 2-1 693-banchi Imajyukuhigashi-cho Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 241-0032 / JP | [2015/27] |
Former [2009/45] | 01 /
SATOH, Toru 2-2 Rinkan 1-chome, 203 Yamato-shi Kanagawa 242-0003 / JP | ||
02 /
SUGIMOTO, Tadanori 1-39 Minamidai 2-chome, 401 Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa 228-0814 / JP | |||
03 /
TAKAHASHI, Minoru 2-1 693-banchi Imajyukuhigashi-cho Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 241-0032 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2015/27] |
Former [2009/45] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08711839.4 | 22.02.2008 | [2009/45] | WO2008JP53068 | Priority number, date | JP20070044379 | 23.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007044379 | [2009/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008102872 | Date: | 28.08.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2113768 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2113768 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/54, G01N30/46, G01N30/74 | [2009/45] | CPC: |
G01N30/30 (EP,US);
G01N30/54 (EP,KR,US);
G01N30/46 (KR);
G01N30/74 (KR);
G01N2030/3084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/27] |
Former [2009/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SÄULENOFEN MIT DOPPELTER TEMPERATURKONTROLLE | [2009/45] | English: | COLUMN OVEN WITH DOUBLE TEMPERATURE CONTROL | [2009/45] | French: | FOUR À COLONNE À DOUBLE RÉGULATION DE TEMPÉRATURE | [2009/45] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2009 | Translation filed | 01.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 01.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/45] | 04.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.02.2008 | AT | 01.07.2015 | BE | 01.07.2015 | BG | 01.07.2015 | CY | 01.07.2015 | CZ | 01.07.2015 | DK | 01.07.2015 | EE | 01.07.2015 | ES | 01.07.2015 | FI | 01.07.2015 | HR | 01.07.2015 | LT | 01.07.2015 | LV | 01.07.2015 | MC | 01.07.2015 | NL | 01.07.2015 | PL | 01.07.2015 | RO | 01.07.2015 | SE | 01.07.2015 | SI | 01.07.2015 | SK | 01.07.2015 | TR | 01.07.2015 | NO | 01.10.2015 | GR | 02.10.2015 | IS | 01.11.2015 | PT | 02.11.2015 | IE | 22.02.2016 | LU | 22.02.2016 | CH | 29.02.2016 | LI | 29.02.2016 | MT | 29.02.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 22.02.2008 | |
AT | 01.07.2015 | ||
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CY | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
NL | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
TR | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
IE | 22.02.2016 | ||
LU | 22.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
MT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 22.02.2008 | |
AT | 01.07.2015 | ||
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CY | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
MT | 01.07.2015 | ||
NL | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
IE | 22.02.2016 | ||
LU | 22.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
MT | 01.07.2015 | ||
NL | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
IE | 22.02.2016 | ||
LU | 22.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
IE | 22.02.2016 | ||
LU | 22.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
LU | 22.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
LU | 22.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/43] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
LU | 22.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 01.07.2015 | |
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 01.07.2015 | |
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 01.07.2015 | |
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 01.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS62167473 (SHIMADZU CORP) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 3,4; | [Y]US3846074 (TULUMELLO A, et al) [Y] 3 * abstract * * column 3, line 72 - column 4, line 2 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US4286456 (SISTI GIORGIO, et al) [Y] 4 * abstract * * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 31 * * figure 1 *; | [A]FR2298792 (ANVAR [FR]) [A] 3 * page 1, line 1 - line 39 * * page 2, line 10 - line 16 *; | [A]US6485543 (MACDONALD STEPHEN J [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * figures 4,5 *; | [PX]WO2007138761 (SHIMADZU CORP [JP], et al) [PX] 1,3 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0005] * * figure 1 * | International search | [A]JPS4985188U ; | [A]JP2002055094 (SHIMADZU CORP); | [A]JPH11201957 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JPS4875697U ; | [A]JPS5547613U ; | [A]JP2005140505 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP); | [A]JPH0587793 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2001013126 (SHIMADZU CORP) | by applicant | JP2007044379 | JPH0587793 | JP2005140505 | JP2001013126 |