EP2119051 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING CONTENTION DURING RANDOM ACCESS PROCEDURE IN A MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2009/47] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Seoul 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEONG, Kyeong-In C/O Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
VAN LIESHOUT, Gert Jan C/O Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / GB | 03 /
VAN DER VELDE, Himke C/O Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / GB | 04 /
KIM, Soeng-Hun C/O Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2019/19] |
Former [2009/47] | 01 /
JEONG, Kyeong-In C/O Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
VAN LIESHOUT, Gert Jan C/O Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / GB | |||
03 /
VAN DER VELDE, Himke C/O Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / GB | |||
04 /
KIM, Soeng-Hun C/O Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2009/48] | Ketelaars, Maarten F.J.M. Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J.W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2009/47] | Ketelaars, Maarten F.J.M. Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J.W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 08712279.2 | 01.02.2008 | [2009/47] | WO2008KR00623 | Priority number, date | KR20070014024 | 09.02.2007 Original published format: KR 20070014024 | [2009/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008096984 | Date: | 14.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2119051 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2119051 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08 | [2013/50] | CPC: |
H04W74/0841 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0061 (KR);
H04W28/04 (KR);
H04W74/0866 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/47] | H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/19] |
Former [2009/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG EINES ZUGRIFFSKONFLIKTES WÄHREND EINES DIREKTZUGRIFFES IN EINEM MOBILEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2009/47] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING CONTENTION DURING RANDOM ACCESS PROCEDURE IN A MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2009/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DÉTECTION D'UN CONFLIT PENDANT UNE PROCÉDURE D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 06.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 06.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14165313.9 / EP2763490 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.02.2008 | AT | 08.05.2019 | CY | 08.05.2019 | CZ | 08.05.2019 | DK | 08.05.2019 | EE | 08.05.2019 | HR | 08.05.2019 | LT | 08.05.2019 | LV | 08.05.2019 | MC | 08.05.2019 | MT | 08.05.2019 | PL | 08.05.2019 | RO | 08.05.2019 | SI | 08.05.2019 | SK | 08.05.2019 | TR | 08.05.2019 | BG | 08.08.2019 | NO | 08.08.2019 | GR | 09.08.2019 | IS | 08.09.2019 | PT | 08.09.2019 | IE | 01.02.2020 | LU | 01.02.2020 | [2022/30] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 01.02.2008 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
MT | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
IE | 01.02.2020 | ||
LU | 01.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
IE | 01.02.2020 | ||
LU | 01.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
LU | 01.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
LU | 01.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 08.05.2019 | |
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HR | 08.05.2019 | |
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | HR | 08.05.2019 | |
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | LT | 08.05.2019 | |
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | LT | 08.05.2019 | |
NO | 08.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1742379 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1,8,15,20 * page 7, line 22, paragraph 61 - line 27 * * page 7, line 27, paragraph 61 - line 29 * * page 7, line 49, paragraph 61 - line 52 * [A] 2-7,9-14,16-19,21-24; | [A]WO0101641 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-24 * page 6, line 14 - line 15; figure 2 * * page 6, line 8 - line 9; figure 2 * * page 6, line 5 - line 9; figure 2 * * page 4, line 27 - line 28; figure 2 * * page 6, line 20 - line 22; figure 2 * * page 5, line 21 - line 22 * | [XY] - ERICSSON (RAPPORTEUR), "Contention Resolution", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-062494, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20060825), vol. RAN WG2, no. Tallinn; 20060825, XP050132064 [X] 1-6,8-13,15-18,20-23 * page 2, line 8, paragraph 4 - line 9 * * page 3, line 1 * * page 3, line 4 - line 5 * * page 3, line 11 * * page 3, line 16 - line 17 * * figure 2 * * figure 3 * [Y] 7,14,19,24 | [XY] - ERICSSON, "UE Identity Handling in LTE", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-060969, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20060323), vol. RAN WG2, no. Athens, Greece; 20060323, XP050130898 [X] 1-6,8-13,15-18,20-23 * page 3, line 1 - line 15; figure 1 * * page 1, line 10, paragraph 2; table 1 * * page 3, line 9 - line 10 * [Y] 7,14,19,24 | [A] - ERICSSON, "Random Access Procedures for LTE", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-060866, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20060323), vol. RAN WG2, no. Athens, Greece; 20060323, XP050131007 [A] 1-24 * paragraph [02.2] - paragraph [05.2]; figures 1-5 * | International search | [A]US6917602 (TOSKALA ANTTI [FI], et al); | [A]US6937641 (LI DON [US], et al); | [A]US2004146019 (KIM SOENG-HUN [KR], et al); | [A]JP2004064560 (NEC CORP) | Examination | - ZTE ET AL, "random access procedures", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-061881, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20060621), vol. RAN WG2, no. Cannes, France; 20060621, XP050141916 | - ERICSSON, "ID-specific CRC on DL-SCH/UL-SCH", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-071035, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070206), vol. RAN WG1, no. St. Louis, USA; 20070206, XP050105033 | - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA) and Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access Network (E-UTRAN); Overall description; Stage 2 (Release 8)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 36.300, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070201), no. V0.5.0, pages 1 - 73, XP050380379 |