EP2115500 - FLEXIBLE LENS ASSEMBLY WITH VARIABLE FOCAL LENGTH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PoLight AS Kongeveien 77 3188 Horten / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | For all designated states Polight AS Kongeveien 77 3188 Horten / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENRIKSEN, Lars Planetveien 6 N-3113 Tønsberg / NO | 02 /
ELIASSEN, Morten Tjærildveien 3 N-3222 Sandefjord / NO | 03 /
KARTASHOV, Vladimir Knarrestien 41 N-3189 Horten / NO | 04 /
ULVENSOEN, Jon, Herman Hans Heyerdahls vei 15 NO-3179 Äsgärdstrand / NO | 05 /
IB-RUNE, Johansen Svensenga 174 0882 Oslo / NO | 06 /
HAUGHOLT, Karl Henrik Fredriksborgveien 36 0286 Oslo / NO | 07 /
WANG, Dag Torstein Langsetveien 18 0495 Oslo / NO | 08 /
TYHOLDT, Frode Maridalsveien 229A 0467 Oslo / NO | 09 /
BOOIJ, Wilfred Hellersdamsveien 10 2009 Nordby / NO | [2010/28] |
Former [2009/46] | 01 /
HENRIKSEN, Lars Planetveien 6 N-3113 Tønsberg / NO | ||
02 /
ELIASSEN, Morten Tjærildveien 3 N-3222 Sandefjord / NO | |||
03 /
KARTASHOV, Vladimir Knarrestien 41 N-3189 Horten / NO | |||
04 /
ULVENSOEN, Jon, Herman Hans Heyerdahls vei 15 NO-3179 Äsgärdstrand / NO | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Rued Langgaards Vej 8 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | ||
Former [2011/46] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S PO Box 1003 Sentrum Nedre Vollgate 4 0158 Oslo / NO | ||
Former [2010/29] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S PO Box 1003 Sentrum Nedre Vollgate 4 0158 Oslo / NO | ||
Former [2009/46] | Roman Ekstedt, Måns Zacco Norway AS Haakon VII's gt. 2 P.O. Box 2003 Vika N-0125 Oslo / NO | Application number, filing date | 08712671.0 | 12.02.2008 | [2009/46] | WO2008NO00056 | Priority number, date | NO20070000803 | 12.02.2007 Original published format: NO 20070803 | [2009/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008100154 | Date: | 21.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2115500 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2115500 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 21.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G02B3/14, G02B1/06, G03B13/36 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
G03B3/10 (EP,US);
G02B3/14 (EP,KR,US);
G02B1/06 (KR);
G02B26/0875 (EP,US);
G02B3/12 (KR);
G03B13/36 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/46] | Title | German: | FLEXIBLE LINSENBAUGRUPPE MIT VARIABLER BRENNWEITE | [2009/46] | English: | FLEXIBLE LENS ASSEMBLY WITH VARIABLE FOCAL LENGTH | [2009/46] | French: | STRUCTURE DE LENTILLE SOUPLE À DISTANCE FOCALE VARIABLE | [2009/46] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2009 | Search fee paid | 11.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 07.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.02.2008 | AT | 16.11.2011 | BE | 16.11.2011 | CY | 16.11.2011 | CZ | 16.11.2011 | DK | 16.11.2011 | EE | 16.11.2011 | FI | 16.11.2011 | HR | 16.11.2011 | IT | 16.11.2011 | LT | 16.11.2011 | LV | 16.11.2011 | MT | 16.11.2011 | PL | 16.11.2011 | RO | 16.11.2011 | SE | 16.11.2011 | SI | 16.11.2011 | SK | 16.11.2011 | TR | 16.11.2011 | IE | 12.02.2012 | LU | 12.02.2012 | BG | 16.02.2012 | NO | 16.02.2012 | GR | 17.02.2012 | ES | 27.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | IS | 16.03.2012 | PT | 16.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
MT | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
TR | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 12.02.2012 | ||
LU | 12.02.2012 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
MT | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
TR | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 12.02.2012 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
MT | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 12.02.2012 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 12.02.2012 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 12.02.2012 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 12.02.2012 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 16.11.2011 | |
BE | 16.11.2011 | ||
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
CY | 16.11.2011 | ||
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
HR | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 16.11.2011 | |
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
NO | 16.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
NO | 16.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11133210 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]US2002149864 (KANEKO SHINJI [JP]) [A] 1-14* figures 4a-4b; claims 1-8 *; | [AP]WO2007017089 (ZEISS CARL SMT AG [DE], et al) [AP] 1-14 * abstract * | International search | [A]US2005036195 (NISHIOKA KIMIHIKO [JP]); | [A]WO2005085930 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al); | [A]US2006028734 (KUIPER STEIN [NL], et al) | by applicant | US4802746 | JPH01140118 | JPH02178602 | US2002048096 | WO2006136613 | NO20060005237 |