EP2120968 - USE OF D-RIBOSE TO TREAT ATRIAL FIBRILLATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/48] | USE OF D-RIBOSE TO TREAT CARDIAC ARRHYTHMIAS | ||
[2010/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bioenergy Inc. 13840 Johnson Street, Northeast Ham Lake, MN 55304 / US | [2009/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERRICK, James, D. 1375 Waterford Drive Golden Valley, MN 55432 / US | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Lucas, Phillip Brian Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Lucas, Phillip Brian Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08713225.4 | 23.01.2008 | [2009/48] | WO2008US00845 | Priority number, date | US20070881940P | 23.01.2007 Original published format: US 881940 P | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008091618 | Date: | 31.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2120968 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2120968 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/70, A61P9/06 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
A61K31/70 (EP,US);
A61K31/7004 (EP,US);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON D-RIBOSE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON VORHOFFLIMMERN | [2010/23] | English: | USE OF D-RIBOSE TO TREAT ATRIAL FIBRILLATIONS | [2010/23] | French: | UTILISATION DE D-RIBOSE DANS LE TRAITEMENT DES FIBRILLATIONS AURICULAIRES | [2010/23] |
Former [2009/48] | VERWENDUNG VON D-RIBOSE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HERZARRYTHMIE | ||
Former [2009/48] | USE OF D-RIBOSE TO TREAT CARDIAC ARRHYTHMIAS | ||
Former [2009/48] | UTILISATION DE D-RIBOSE DANS LE TRAITEMENT DES ARYTHMIES CARDIAQUES | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 01.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.11.2010 | CZ | 10.11.2010 | DK | 10.11.2010 | EE | 10.11.2010 | FI | 10.11.2010 | HR | 10.11.2010 | HU | 10.11.2010 | LT | 10.11.2010 | LV | 10.11.2010 | MT | 10.11.2010 | PL | 10.11.2010 | RO | 10.11.2010 | SE | 10.11.2010 | SI | 10.11.2010 | SK | 10.11.2010 | LU | 23.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | BG | 10.02.2011 | NO | 10.02.2011 | GR | 11.02.2011 | IS | 10.03.2011 | PT | 10.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/25] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
MT | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
LU | 23.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
MT | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]RU2127548 ; | [A]US4719201 (FOKER JOHN E [US]) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [X]WO9404158 (PLIML WOLFGANG [DE]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 24, Database accession no. 2000-281310, XP002476749 & RU2127548 C1 19990320 (ALABOVSKII V V) [X] 1,5 * abstract * | [X] - LIU, PINGHUAI ET AL, "Research of anti-myocardial ischemia and anti-arrhythmia cordis effect of D-ribose", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (2005), Database accession no. 2006:1033194, URL: STN, XP002476117 [X] 1,5 * abstract * | [A] - "RAPID COMMUNICATION. RIBOSE ACCELERATES THE REPLETION OF THE ATP POOL DURING RECOVERY FROM REVERSIBLE ISCHEMIA OF THE RAT MYOCARDIUM", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR CARDIOLOGY, (198409), vol. 16, no. 9, ISSN 0022-2828, pages 863 - 866, XP000856788 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * |