EP2251070 - SLOT MOTORCYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bycmo RC Models, S.L. C. Motors, 10 Pol. Ind. Compte de Sert 08755 Castellbisbal / ES | [2010/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDRES BERENGUER, Joan C/ Motors N[deg] 10 Pol. Ind. Comte de Sert E-08755 Castellbisbal, Barcelona / ES | 02 /
PONS PRATS, Jordi C/ Motors N[deg] 10 Pol. Ind. Comte de Sert E-08755 Castellbisbal, Barcelona / ES | 03 /
BARRAGÁN LÓPEZ, Jose Antonio C/ Motors N[deg] 10 Pol. Ind. Comte de Sert E-08755 Castellbisbal, Barcelona / ES | [2010/46] | Representative(s) | Barroso Sánchez-Lafuente, Ignacio M. Barroso Hernández C/ Calvet 5, 2[deg] 2 08021 Barcelona / ES | [2013/46] |
Former [2010/46] | Barroso Sánchez-Lafuente, Ignacio M. Barroso Hernandez C/ Balmes 92 2[deg] 1 08008 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 08714231.1 | 28.03.2008 | [2010/46] | WO2008ES00183 | Priority number, date | ES20080000276 | 01.02.2008 Original published format: ES 200800276 | [2010/46] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009095506 | Date: | 06.08.2009 | Language: | ES | [2009/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2251070 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 06.08.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A63H17/21, A63H18/12 | [2010/46] | CPC: |
A63H17/21 (EP,ES,US);
A63H18/08 (EP,US);
A63H18/12 (EP,ES,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/46] | Title | German: | MOTORRAD MIT SCHLITZ | [2010/46] | English: | SLOT MOTORCYCLE | [2010/46] | French: | MOTOCYCLETTE DE COURSE SUR CIRCUIT MINIATURE | [2010/46] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2008 | Translation filed | 31.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2010/46] | 01.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/13] | 30.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2096905 (CHERYCO CORP); | [A]ES2067384 (PABLOS BAEZA CARLOS JESUS DE [ES]); | [A]US6095892 (MOE COURTNEY A [GB]); | [A]GB2390982 (ALL STARS RACING LTD [GB]); | [A]WO2004009199 (HORNBY HOBBIES LTD [GB], et al); | [A]GB2408218 (ROUTLEDGE THOMAS HENRY JAMES [GB]); | [A]JP2008011997 (WIZ CO LTD) | by applicant | ES2067384 | US6626116 | GB2390982 | WO2004009199 |