EP2104286 - DATA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, SWITCHING NETWORK BOARD AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZANG, Dajun Huawei Administration Building Bantian LonggangDistrict Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZHOU, Da Huawei Administration Building Bantian LonggangDistrict Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
FAN, Lingqiang Huawei Administration Building Bantian LonggangDistrict Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
YE, Jinhua Huawei Administration Building Bantian LonggangDistrict Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
YANG, Dongcheng Huawei Administration Building Bantian LonggangDistrict Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 06 /
GAI, Gang Huawei Administration Building Bantian LonggangDistrict Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 07 /
WANG, Ziqiang Huawei Administration Building Bantian LonggangDistrict Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2009/39] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Thun, Clemens, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08715232.8 | 13.03.2008 | [2009/39] | WO2008CN70496 | Priority number, date | CN20071076307 | 29.06.2007 Original published format: CN200710076307 | [2009/39] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009003374 | Date: | 08.01.2009 | Language: | ZH | [2009/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2104286 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.01.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
H04L49/15 (EP,US);
H04L49/206 (EP,US);
H04L49/30 (EP,US);
H04L49/45 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/39] | Title | German: | DATENKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, VERMITTLUNGSNETZWERKKARTE UND VERFAHREN | [2009/39] | English: | DATA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, SWITCHING NETWORK BOARD AND METHOD | [2009/39] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION DE DONNÉES, CARTE RÉSEAU DE COMMUTATION ET PROCÉDÉ | [2009/39] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2009 | Translation filed | 04.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 04.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 21.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/42] | 01.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US7110394 (CHAMDANI JOSEPH I [US], et al) [X] 1-10,13-15 * abstract * * figures 3-7 * * column 2, lines 11-27, 56-61 * * column 3, lines 5-19, 49-64 * * column 5, lines 4-15, 42-58 * * column 6 * * column 7, lines 26-29 * * column 10, lines 24-65 * [Y] 11-12,16-17; | [XAY]US6597689 (CHIU MANFRED F [US], et al) [X] 1-2,5,8-9,13 * figures 3, 5, 12 * * column 6, lines 13-18 * * page 7, lines 16-20 * * column 20, lines 1-8 * * column 21, line 14 - line 29 * * column 22, line 4 - line 33 * * column 24, line 19 - line 43 * * column 51, lines 27-30, 48-61 * [A] 3-4,6-7,10,14-15 [Y] 11-12,16-17; | [XAY] - FLAVIO BONOMI ED - IBRAHIM HOKELEK ET AL, "On the Evolution of Internet Routers", SARNOFF SYMPOSIUM, 2006 IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20060327), ISBN 978-1-4244-0002-7, pages 1 - 4, XP031266886 [X] 1-2,5,8-9,13 * paragraphs [000I] - [00II] * * paragraphs [00IV] - [00VI] * [A] 3-4,7,10,14-15 [Y] 11-12,16-17 | International search | [X]KR20040039102 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM); | [A]US2006109782 (RA YONGWOOK [KR], et al); | [XP]CN101098238 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) |