EP2117944 - CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jokey Plastik Wipperfürth GmbH Aug.-Mittelsten-Scheid-Strasse 23 51688 Wipperfürth / DE | [2009/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLUMENSCHEIN, Marcus Hauptstrasse 91 51709 Marienheide / DE | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Lippert, Stachow & Partner Patentanwälte Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2009/47] | Lippert, Stachow & Partner Patentanwälte Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 08715466.2 | 11.02.2008 | [2009/47] | WO2008DE00233 | Priority number, date | DE20071007171 | 09.02.2007 Original published format: DE102007007171 | DE20072002213U | 12.02.2007 Original published format: DE 202007002213 U | [2009/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008095483 | Date: | 14.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2117944 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2117944 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65D21/02 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
B65D21/0233 (EP);
B65D21/02 (KR);
B65D1/14 (KR);
B65D1/16 (KR);
B65D2303/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Extension states | AL | 26.08.2009 | BA | 26.08.2009 | RS | 26.08.2009 | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER | [2009/47] | English: | CONTAINER | [2009/47] | French: | RÉCIPIENT | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 26.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.04.2011 | EE | 06.04.2011 | MT | 06.04.2011 | IS | 06.08.2011 | [2013/35] |
Former [2012/13] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
IS | 06.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE29802048U (JOKEY PLASTIK WIPPERFUERTH [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 5,6 *; | [A]US5897019 (STROPKAY SCOTT [US]) [A] 1 * figures 4,5 *; | [A]EP1254842 (RUNDPACK AG [CH]) [A] 1* paragraphs [0004] - [0012]; figures 3-5 * |