EP2146950 - OXIDATION-STABLE CARBOXYLIC ESTERS AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emery Oleochemicals GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2010/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WESTFECHTEL, Alfred Menzelweg 74 40724 Hilden / DE | 02 /
HOF, Matthias Bregrenzer Str. 32 47249 Duisburg / DE | [2010/04] | Representative(s) | Kinkeldey, Daniela, et al Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | Kinkeldey, Daniela, et al Bird & Bird LLP Pacellistrasse 14 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/07] | Herzog, Martin, et al Herzog Fiesser & Partner Immermannstrasse 59 40210 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 08715680.8 | 01.02.2008 | [2010/04] | WO2008EP00821 | Priority number, date | EP20070002256 | 02.02.2007 Original published format: EP 07002256 | [2010/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008092703 | Date: | 07.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2146950 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07C69/30, C07C69/52, C10M105/38 | [2010/04] | CPC: |
C07C69/58 (EP,US);
C10M105/38 (EP,US);
C10M105/40 (EP,US);
C10M2207/283 (EP,US);
C10M2207/2835 (EP,US);
C10M2207/289 (EP,US);
C10M2207/2895 (EP,US);
C10N2020/065 (EP,US);
C10N2020/067 (EP,US);
C10N2020/069 (EP,US);
C10N2030/08 (EP,US);
C10N2030/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/04] | Title | German: | OXIDATIONSSTABILE CARBONSÄUREESTER UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2010/04] | English: | OXIDATION-STABLE CARBOXYLIC ESTERS AND USE THEREOF | [2010/04] | French: | ESTERS D'ACIDE CARBOXYLIQUE STABLES À L'OXYDATION ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2010/04] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2009 | Examination requested [2010/04] | 03.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/23] | 21.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.08.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2187894 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [X] 1-8 * page 5, line 5; example 6; table I *; | [X]JPH11269480 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH10292187 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]WO03097774 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH0543888 (QUAKER CHEM NIPPON, et al) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH06108079 (NIPPON KOKAN KK, et al) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A] - BOHNER G E ET AL, "Properties of polyester fluids with desirable synthetic lubricant characteristics", JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL AND ENGINEERING DATA, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (196210), vol. 7, no. 4, ISSN 0021-9568, pages 547 - 553, XP002264048 [A] 1-8 * page 1, column 1; table III * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/je60015a035 |