EP2054252 - MOTOR VEHICLE HAVING REAR SIDE WINDOWS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2009/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLZ, Andreas Erdinger Str. 4 85551 Kirchheim / DE | [2009/19] | Application number, filing date | 08715817.6 | 16.02.2008 | [2009/19] | WO2008EP01217 | Priority number, date | DE20071009115 | 24.02.2007 Original published format: DE102007009115 | [2009/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008101641 | Date: | 28.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2054252 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2054252 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60J1/17 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
B60J1/17 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/19] | Title | German: | KRAFTFAHRZEUG MIT HINTEREN SEITENSCHEIBEN | [2009/19] | English: | MOTOR VEHICLE HAVING REAR SIDE WINDOWS | [2009/19] | French: | VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE AVEC DES VITRES LATÉRALES ARRIÈRE | [2009/19] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 04.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102004063513 (BROSE FAHRZEUGTEILE [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]FR2605558 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]FR2783467 (ARIES IND STRUCTURE [FR]) [A] 1 * figure - * |