28.10.2016 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
28.10.2016 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] |
02.09.2016 |
Change - applicant |
published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] |
14.07.2016 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
02.03.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.08.2015 |
Change - applicant |
published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] |
25.04.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.03.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.01.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.03.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.10.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.07.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.07.2012 |
First examination report |
|
13.07.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] |
06.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.03.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.12.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.12.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] |
11.12.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] |
06.10.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.10.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.06.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.06.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.05.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.09.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.09.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|