EP2141993 - ANTIMICROBIAL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2016 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 28.10.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant International Ltd Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | [2016/40] |
Former [2015/38] | For all designated states CLARIANT INTERNATIONAL LTD Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | ||
Former [2010/02] | For all designated states Clariant Finance (BVI) Limited Citco Building Wickhams Cay P.O. Box 662 Road Town, Tortola / VG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FALK, Uwe Lönsstrasse 8 63486 Bruchköbel / DE | 02 /
WALTER, Michael, Marcus Am Bahnhof 14 65835 Liederbach / DE | 03 /
GROHMANN, Jörg Am Schäfersberg 20 B 65527 Niedernhausen / DE | [2010/02] | Representative(s) | Mikulecky, Klaus, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent & License Management Chemicals Industriepark Höchst, G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | Mikulecky, Klaus, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Group Intellectual Property Am Unisys-Park 1 65843 Sulzbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 08715876.2 | 20.02.2008 | [2010/02] | WO2008EP01305 | Priority number, date | DE20071009450 | 27.02.2007 Original published format: DE102007009450 | DE20071017178 | 12.04.2007 Original published format: DE102007017178 | [2010/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008104310 | Date: | 04.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2141993 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/80, A01N37/02, A01N37/36, A01N37/40, A01N59/16, A01P3/00, A01P1/00 | [2010/02] | CPC: |
A01N43/80 (EP,US);
A01N59/16 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/80, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N59/16, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N59/16, A01N25/08, A01N25/30, A01N43/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/02] | Title | German: | ANTIMIKROBIELLE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2010/02] | English: | ANTIMICROBIAL COMPOSITIONS | [2010/02] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ANTIMICROBIENNES | [2010/02] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 13.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/48] | 27.10.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.07.2017 | 05.07.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB1389940 (ROHM & HAAS) [X] 1-17 * claims 1-3,13 * * page 7, column 1, paragraph L - column 2, paragraph 1 * [Y] 3,4,14; | [XY]US4150026 (MILLER GEORGE A, et al) [X] 1-17 * claim 1 * * column 17, lines 1-3 * [Y] 3,4,14; | [X]EP0106562 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1-17 * claims 1-10 *; | [X]EP0112610 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1-17 * claims 1-14 *; | [DY]EP0116865 (KANEBO LTD [JP], et al) [DY] 3,4,14* claims 1-8 *; | [DY]EP0251783 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB]) [DY] 3,4,14 * claims 1-8 *; | [XY]WO9107395 (THOR CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-17 * page 4, paragraphs 3,4 * * claims 1-13 * [Y] 3,4,14; | [XY]US5364649 (ROSSMOORE LEONARD A [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * column 2, lines 52-58 * * tables 1,2 * [Y] 3,4,14; | [XY]EP0654470 (RIEDEL DE HAEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-17 * examples 1,4,5 * * claims 1-8 * [Y] 3,4,14; | [X]JPH0892019 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0005] , [0007] , [0009] , [0011] *; | [DY]EP0734651 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB]) [DY] 3,4,14 * claims 1-10 *; | [XY]FR2745579 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [X] 1-17 * claim 7 * * examples 11,12,14-16 * * page 6, lines 3-22 * [Y] 3,4,14; | [XY]EP0834253 (SUGANUMA AKIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-17 * claims 2,3,5 * * examples 1-6 * [Y] 3,4,14; | [XY]JPH11107162 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD) [X] 1-17 * claims 1-7 * * paragraphs [0016] , [0028] , [0071] * [Y] 3,4,14; | [X]JP2000026205 (SUMITOMO OSAKA CEMENT CO LTD) [X] 1-17 * claims 1,5 * * example 6 *; | [X]WO2004009055 (MICROBAN PRODUCTS [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * claims 1,2,4,5 *; | [X]WO2004099308 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1-17 * claims 1,2 * * page 10, lines 16-18 * * page 14, lines 10-14 * * page 16, lines 1,2 *; | [PX]WO2007026004 (THOR GMBH [DE], et al) [PX] 1-17 * claims 1-22 * * page 3, paragraph 3 *; | [PX]WO2007087326 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [PX] 1-17 * claim 2 * * page 6, lines 18-24 *; | [E]EP1941797 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [E] 1-17 * paragraph [0004] *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1984, no. 39, Database accession no. 1984-240128, XP002425225 & JPS59142543 A 19840815 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND CO LTD) [X] 1-17 * abstract * |