EP2129289 - ANALYTICAL SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING AN ANALYTE IN A BODY FLUID AND DISPOSABLE INTEGRATED SAMPLE COLLECTION AND ANALYTICAL ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstraße 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2014/27] |
Former [2009/50] | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | ||
For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIST, Hans Siegfriedstrasse 27 64754 Hesseneck-Kailbach / DE | 02 /
ZIMMER, Volker Höhenweg 7 54497 Morbach / DE | 03 /
KEIL, Michael Richinesstrasse 22a 67071 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2010/01] |
Former [2009/50] | 01 /
LIST, Hans Siegfriedstrasse 27 64754 Hesseneck-Kailbach / DE | ||
02 /
ZIMMER, Volker Burgstr. 17 67229 Laumersheim / DE | |||
03 /
KEIL, Michael Richinesstrasse 22a 67071 Ludwigshafen / DE | Representative(s) | Durm Patentanwälte PartG mbB Patentanwälte Moltkestrasse 45 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/28] | Durm & Partner Patentanwälte Moltkestrasse 45 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [2009/50] | Durm & Partner Moltkestrasse 45 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 08716244.2 | 05.03.2008 | [2009/50] | WO2008EP01726 | Priority number, date | EP20070005222 | 14.03.2007 Original published format: EP 07005222 | [2009/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008110287 | Date: | 18.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2129289 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2129289 | Date: | 09.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/15 | [2009/50] | CPC: |
A61B5/157 (EP,US);
A61B5/1405 (KR);
A61B5/14 (KR);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150175 (EP,US);
A61B5/150358 (EP,US);
A61B5/150435 (EP,US);
A61B5/150511 (EP,US);
A61B5/150572 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANALYSESYSTEM ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES ANALYTEN IN EINER KÖRPERFLÜSSIGKEIT UND DISPOSIBLES INTEGRIERTES PROBENGEWINNUNGS- UND ANALYSEELEMENT | [2009/50] | English: | ANALYTICAL SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING AN ANALYTE IN A BODY FLUID AND DISPOSABLE INTEGRATED SAMPLE COLLECTION AND ANALYTICAL ELEMENT | [2009/50] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ANALYSE POUR LA DÉTERMINATION D'UN ANALYTE DANS UN LIQUIDE CORPOREL, ET ÉLÉMENT DE PRÉLÈVEMENT D'ÉCHANTILLON ET D'ANALYSE INTÉGRÉ JETABLE | [2009/50] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/50] | 07.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.02.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.03.2008 | CY | 09.07.2014 | CZ | 09.07.2014 | DK | 09.07.2014 | EE | 09.07.2014 | ES | 09.07.2014 | FI | 09.07.2014 | HR | 09.07.2014 | LT | 09.07.2014 | LV | 09.07.2014 | MC | 09.07.2014 | MT | 09.07.2014 | NL | 09.07.2014 | PL | 09.07.2014 | RO | 09.07.2014 | SE | 09.07.2014 | SI | 09.07.2014 | SK | 09.07.2014 | TR | 09.07.2014 | BG | 09.10.2014 | NO | 09.10.2014 | GR | 10.10.2014 | IS | 09.11.2014 | PT | 10.11.2014 | AT | 05.03.2015 | IE | 05.03.2015 | LU | 05.03.2015 | BE | 31.03.2015 | CH | 31.03.2015 | LI | 31.03.2015 | [2017/40] |
Former [2017/03] | CY | 09.07.2014 | |
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
MT | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SI | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
AT | 05.03.2015 | ||
IE | 05.03.2015 | ||
LU | 05.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CY | 09.07.2014 | |
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SI | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
AT | 05.03.2015 | ||
IE | 05.03.2015 | ||
LU | 05.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CY | 09.07.2014 | |
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SI | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
IE | 05.03.2015 | ||
LU | 05.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | CY | 09.07.2014 | |
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SI | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
LU | 05.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 09.07.2014 | |
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SI | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
LU | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | CY | 09.07.2014 | |
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
LU | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 09.07.2014 | |
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 09.07.2014 | |
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 09.07.2014 | |
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 09.07.2014 | |
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
HR | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 09.07.2014 | |
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 09.07.2014 | |
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
NO | 09.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 09.07.2014 | |
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 09.07.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO2007025713 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [X] 1-7,10-16 * paragraphs [0031] - [0040]; figures 1-4 * [A] 8,9,18; | [AD]WO2006092281 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] 1-16,18 * abstract * |