EP2126637 - LIQUID DEVELOPER COMPOSITION AND METHOD OF ITS PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AEG Elektrofotografie GmbH Emil-Siepmann-Strasse 40 59581 Warstein / DE | [2009/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HYMON, Kerstin Fröbelstrasse 21 58454 Witten / DE | 02 /
HUMPERT, Hans-Josef Rüdenkuhle 28 59555 Lippstadt / DE | 03 /
TAVERNIER, Serge Bouwenstraat 40 B-2547 Lint / BE | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Teipel, Stephan, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/23] | Teipel, Stephan, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/49] | Teipel, Stephan, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08716632.8 | 19.03.2008 | [2009/49] | WO2008EP02214 | Priority number, date | EP20070005667 | 20.03.2007 Original published format: EP 07005667 | [2009/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008113582 | Date: | 25.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2126637 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2126637 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/08, G03G9/13, G03G9/135 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
G03G9/12 (EP,US);
G03G9/08 (KR);
G03G9/122 (EP,US);
G03G9/13 (KR);
G03G9/131 (EP,US);
G03G9/135 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGENTWICKLERZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2009/49] | English: | LIQUID DEVELOPER COMPOSITION AND METHOD OF ITS PREPARATION | [2009/49] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉVÉLATEUR LIQUIDE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 21.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.03.2008 | AT | 06.06.2012 | BE | 06.06.2012 | CY | 06.06.2012 | CZ | 06.06.2012 | DK | 06.06.2012 | EE | 06.06.2012 | FI | 06.06.2012 | HR | 06.06.2012 | IT | 06.06.2012 | LT | 06.06.2012 | LV | 06.06.2012 | MT | 06.06.2012 | NL | 06.06.2012 | PL | 06.06.2012 | RO | 06.06.2012 | SE | 06.06.2012 | SI | 06.06.2012 | SK | 06.06.2012 | TR | 06.06.2012 | BG | 06.09.2012 | NO | 06.09.2012 | GR | 07.09.2012 | ES | 17.09.2012 | IS | 06.10.2012 | PT | 08.10.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
HR | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
MT | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
TR | 06.06.2012 | ||
BG | 06.09.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
ES | 17.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
HR | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
MT | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
BG | 06.09.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
ES | 17.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
HR | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
BG | 06.09.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
ES | 17.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
HR | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
ES | 17.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
DK | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
HR | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
HR | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
PT | 08.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
HR | 06.06.2012 | ||
IT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
PL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
HR | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
HR | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
HR | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
NL | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 06.06.2012 | |
BE | 06.06.2012 | ||
CY | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
HR | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
HR | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
HR | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
LV | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 06.06.2012 | |
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
SE | 06.06.2012 | ||
NO | 06.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 06.06.2012 | |
NO | 06.09.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS61156264 (RICOH KK) [X] 1-7,9-13,20 * page 7; table 1 * * claim 1 *; | [X]JPS61156263 (RICOH KK) [X] 1-7,9-13,20 * page 6; table 1 * * claim 1 *; | [X]JPS61156261 (RICOH KK) [X] 1-7,9-13,20 * page 7; table 1 * * claim 1 *; | [X]JPS6218575 (RICOH KK) [X] 1-7,9-13,20 * page 7; table 1 * * claim 1 *; | [X]JPS6298364 (RICOH KK) [X] 1-7,9-13,20 * page 7; table 1 * * claim 1 *; | [X]JPS62115171 (RICOH KK) [X] 1-7,9-13,20 * page 6; table . * * claim 1 *; | [XY]EP0455343 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1-14,16-20 * page 6, line 22 - line 32 * * page 8, line 52 - line 57 * * page 10, line 9 - page 11, line 20 * * page 11, line 56 - page 12, line 11 * * page 12, line 39 - page 13, line 2 * * page 17, line 13 - line 29; claims 1,5-7 * [Y] 15; | [X]EP0605108 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1-10,12-14,16-20 * page 5, line 7 - line 25 * * page 8, line 5 - page 9, line 2 * * page 10, line 11 - page 13, line 24 * * page 16, line 19 - line 43 * * page 19, line 1 - line 36 *; | [X]US5607808 (NISHIZAWA MASUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10,12,13,20 * column 4, line 11 - line 13 * * column 8, line 24 - line 42 * * column 11, line 41 - line 46 * * column 13, line 35 - column 14, line 45 * * column 27, line 4 - line 45 * * column 28, line 64 - column 29, line 5 *; | [X]US2005244736 (YON KYUNG-YOL [KR], et al) [X] 1-13,20 * paragraphs [0042] , [0043] , [0059] , [0060]; claims 1,2 *; | [Y]EP1607799 (RICOH KK [JP]) [Y] 15 * page 4, line 4 - line 46 * * page 5, line 2 - line 12 * * page 5, line 38 - line 49 ** page 9, line 10 - page 10, line 13 * | Examination | JPH03119365 | WO2007018503 | by applicant | JPH03119365 | US5607808 | US5998075 | US6174640 | EP1341053 | EP1437628 | WO2005116778 | WO2007018503 |