EP2130048 - APEX AS A MARKER FOR LUNG CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstraße 124 4070 Basel / CH | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGMANN, Marie-Luise Saalangerstr. 42 82377 Penzberg / DE | 02 /
KARL, Johann Bert-Schratzlseer-Str. 7 82380 Peissenberg / DE | 03 /
KLOECKNER, Julia Kleinstrasse 3 81379 München / DE | 04 /
ROESSLER, Markus Eichenstr. 9a 82110 Germering / DE | 05 /
TACKE, Michael Geisenfelderstr. 7 80689 München / DE | 06 /
THIEROLF, Michael Haydnweg 4 88400 Biberach / DE | [2009/50] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Wolfgang, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Weiss, Wolfgang, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08716640.1 | 19.03.2008 | [2009/50] | WO2008EP02224 | Priority number, date | EP20070006079 | 23.03.2007 Original published format: EP 07006079 | [2009/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008116592 | Date: | 02.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2130048 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2130048 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/574, G01N33/573 | [2009/50] | CPC: |
G01N33/57423 (EP,US);
G01N33/57488 (EP,US);
G01N2333/988 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/50] | Title | German: | APEX ALS MARKER FÜR LUNGENKREBS | [2009/50] | English: | APEX AS A MARKER FOR LUNG CANCER | [2009/50] | French: | APEX COMME MARQUEUR POUR LE CANCER DU POUMON | [2009/50] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/50] | 02.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.03.2008 | BE | 18.04.2012 | CY | 18.04.2012 | CZ | 18.04.2012 | DK | 18.04.2012 | EE | 18.04.2012 | FI | 18.04.2012 | HR | 18.04.2012 | LT | 18.04.2012 | LV | 18.04.2012 | MT | 18.04.2012 | NL | 18.04.2012 | PL | 18.04.2012 | RO | 18.04.2012 | SE | 18.04.2012 | SI | 18.04.2012 | SK | 18.04.2012 | TR | 18.04.2012 | BG | 18.07.2012 | NO | 18.07.2012 | GR | 19.07.2012 | IS | 18.08.2012 | PT | 20.08.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | BE | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
MT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
TR | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/32] | BE | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
MT | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | BE | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | BE | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | BE | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
NL | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 18.04.2012 | |
CY | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
HR | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
PL | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 18.04.2012 | |
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
SE | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 18.04.2012 | |
NO | 18.07.2012 | Cited in | International search | [DXY]WO9747971 (ADVANCED RES & TECH INST [US], et al) [DX] 1-6 * the whole document * * in particular: claims 1,3,4,6,11-15,17,18. * [Y] 7-10; | [DXY]WO02076280 (YEDA RES & DEV [IL], et al) [DX] 1-6 * the whole document * * in particular: claims 1-5,16,37-41. * [Y] 7-10; | [DA] - PUGLISI F ET AL, "Prognostic significance of Ape1/ref-1 subcellular localization in non-small cell lung carcinomas.", ANTICANCER RESEARCH, (200111), vol. 21, no. 6A, pages 4041 - 4049, XP008083956 [DA] 1-10 * the whole document * * in particular: abstract; p.4043, col.1, par.3; p.4044, col.2, par.5; fig.3. * | [YA] - SCHNEIDER J, "Tumor markers in detection of lung cancer.", ADVANCES IN CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (2006), vol. 42, pages 1 - 41, XP008083971 [Y] 7-10 * the whole document * * in particular: section 6 spanning p.6+7. * [A] 2-5 | [YA] - MOLINA R ET AL, "Pro-gastrin-releasing peptide (proGRP) in patients with benign and malignant diseases: comparison with CEA, SCC, CYFRA 21-1 and NSE in patients with lung cancer.", ANTICANCER RESEARCH, (200505), vol. 25, no. 3A, pages 1773 - 1778, XP008083991 [Y] 7-10 * the whole document * * in particular: abstract. * [A] 2-5 |