EP2121954 - CORYNEFORM BACTERIA WITH FORMATE-THF-SYNTHETASE AND/OR GLYCINE CLEAVAGE ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1- 11 45128 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZELDER, Oskar Franz-Stützel-Strasse 8 67346 Speyer / DE | 02 /
SCHRÖDER, Hartwig Benzstrasse 4 69226 Nussloch / DE | 03 /
KLOPPROGGE, Corinna Zähringer Strasse 39 68239 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
HEROLD, Andrea Karlsruher Strasse 131 68775 Ketsch / DE | 05 /
HAEFNER, Stefan Korngasse 28 67346 Speyer / DE | 06 /
PATTERSON, Thomas A. 89 Church Street North Attleboro, MA 02760 / US | 07 /
PERO, Janice G., OmniGene Bioproducts, Inc. 25K Olympia Avenue, Suite 400 Woburn, MA 01801 / US | 08 /
YOCUM, R. Rogers 4 Orchard Lane Lexington, MA 02420 / US | [2009/48] | Application number, filing date | 08716849.8 | 14.02.2008 | [2009/48] | WO2008EP51795 | Priority number, date | EP20070102652 | 19.02.2007 Original published format: EP 07102652 | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008101857 | Date: | 28.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2121954 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12P13/12, C12N15/52, C12N15/77 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
C12N15/52 (EP,US);
C12P13/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | CORYNEFORME BAKTERIEN MIT FORMAT-THF-SYNTHETASE- UND/ODER GLYCIN-SPALTUNGSAKTIVITÄT | [2009/48] | English: | CORYNEFORM BACTERIA WITH FORMATE-THF-SYNTHETASE AND/OR GLYCINE CLEAVAGE ACTIVITY | [2009/48] | French: | BACTÉRIE DE TYPE CORYNÉEN AVEC ACTIVITÉ FORMIATE-THF-SYNTHÉTASE ET/OU CLIVAGE DE GLYCOCOLLE | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 14.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/07] | 26.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/07] | Divisional application(s) | EP11193520.1 / EP2431476 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.12.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.11.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 15.11.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.12.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2006138689 (MICROBIA INC [US], et al) [Y] 18,19,22,38,39 * abstract * * page 78, line 5 - page 79, line 11; figure 4B *; | [PX]WO2007020295 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [PX] 1-5,7,8,16,17,20,21,23-27,29,36,37,40-45 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO2007090810 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 23,24,27,29,36,37,40-44 * the whole document * | [X] - STABEN C ET AL, "Nucleotide sequence of the Saccharomyces cerevisiae ADE3 gene encoding C1-tetrahydrofolate synthase", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY 1986 US, (1986), vol. 261, no. 10, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 4629 - 4637, XP002486090 [X] 23,24,27,29,42-44 * abstract * | [IY] - KROMER ET AL, "Metabolic pathway analysis for rational design of L-methionine production by Escherichia coli and Corynebacterium glutamicum", METABOLIC ENGINEERING, ACADEMIC PRESS, US, (20060701), vol. 8, no. 4, ISSN 1096-7176, pages 353 - 369, XP005502384 [I] 1-5,7,8,16,17,20,21,23-27,29,36,37,40-45 * the whole document * [Y] 6,18,19,22,28,38,39 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymben.2006.02.001 | [Y] - NAGY P L ET AL, "Formyltetrahydrofolate hydrolase, a regulatory enzyme that functions to balance pools of tetrahydrofolate and one-carbon tetrahydrofolate adducts in Escherichia coli", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19950301), vol. 177, no. 5, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 1292 - 1298, XP002105623 [Y] 6,28 * abstract * * page 1297, column 1, line 12 - line 19 * | [DA] - "Formate--tetrahydrofolate ligase (EC 6.3.4.3) (Formyltetrahydrofolate synthetase) (FHS) (FTHFS).", UniProt, (20050802), Database accession no. Q4JVW2, URL: EBI, XP002486091 [DA] 5,27 * the whole document * | [DA] - TAUCH A ET AL, "Complete Genome Sequence and Analysis of the Multiresistant Nosocomial Pathogen Corynebacterium jeikeium K411, a Lipid-Requiring Bacterium of the Human Skin Flora", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20050701), vol. 187, no. 13, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 4671 - 4682, XP007904509 [DA] 16,17,20,36,37,40 * page 4676, column 2, line 13 - line 20 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.187.13.4671-4682.2005 | Examination | - SAHM HERMANN ET AL, "Metabolic design in amino acid producing bacterium Corynebacterium glutamicum", FEMS MICROBIOLOGY REVIEWS, (1995), vol. 16, no. 2-3, doi:doi:10.1016/0168-6445(94)00084-C, ISSN 0168-6445, pages 243 - 252, XP002730850 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-6445(94)00084-C |