EP2118509 - ELECTRO-MECHANICAL COUPLING ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ACKER, Andreas Kratzerach 7 88074 Meckenbeuren / DE | 02 /
MIEHLE, Frank Tobelweg 17 88090 Immenstaad / DE | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/45] | Application number, filing date | 08717154.2 | 27.02.2008 | [2009/47] | WO2008EP52342 | Priority number, date | DE20071011766 | 10.03.2007 Original published format: DE102007011766 | [2009/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008110457 | Date: | 18.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2118509 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2118509 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16D27/00, F16D23/12 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
F16D28/00 (EP);
F16D23/12 (EP);
F16D2023/123 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | ELEKTROMECHANISCHER KUPPLUNGSAKTUATOR | [2009/47] | English: | ELECTRO-MECHANICAL COUPLING ACTUATOR | [2009/47] | French: | ACTIONNEUR D'EMBRAYAGE ÉLECTROMÉCANIQUE | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 30.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.02.2008 | CY | 09.11.2011 | CZ | 09.11.2011 | DK | 09.11.2011 | EE | 09.11.2011 | FI | 09.11.2011 | HR | 09.11.2011 | IE | 09.11.2011 | LT | 09.11.2011 | LV | 09.11.2011 | MT | 09.11.2011 | NL | 09.11.2011 | PL | 09.11.2011 | RO | 09.11.2011 | SI | 09.11.2011 | SK | 09.11.2011 | TR | 09.11.2011 | BG | 09.02.2012 | NO | 09.02.2012 | GR | 10.02.2012 | ES | 20.02.2012 | GB | 27.02.2012 | LU | 27.02.2012 | BE | 28.02.2012 | SE | 28.02.2012 | CH | 29.02.2012 | LI | 29.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | IS | 09.03.2012 | PT | 09.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IE | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
MT | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
TR | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 20.02.2012 | ||
GB | 27.02.2012 | ||
LU | 27.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
SE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IE | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
MT | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
TR | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 20.02.2012 | ||
GB | 27.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
SE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/46] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IE | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
MT | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 20.02.2012 | ||
GB | 27.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
SE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IE | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
MT | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
GB | 27.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
SE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IE | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
GB | 27.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
SE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IE | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
GB | 27.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
SE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IE | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
SE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IE | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
SE | 28.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IE | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
SE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IE | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IE | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
IE | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 09.11.2011 | |
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
NO | 09.02.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6012561 (REED JR RICHARD G [US], et al) [X] 1-5,13-15 * figures 2,2a,2b *; | [X]DE10313739 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [X] 1,2,6-9,11,15 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [X]WO03087609 (INA SCHAEFFLER KG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8,10-12,15 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [X]WO2004053347 (KEMPER YVES J [US]) [X] 1,2,6-8,11,15* figure - * |