EP2122739 - NITROXIDES FOR LITHIUM-ION BATTERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HINTERMANN, Tobias Lehmgrubenweg 12 CH-4106 Therwil / CH | 02 /
NESVADBA, Peter Route des Pralettes 83A CH-1723 Marly / CH | 03 /
FREY, Markus Alte Saline 12 CH-4310 Rheinfelden / CH | 04 /
BUGNON FOLGER, Lucienne Steingrubenweg 12 4148 Pfeffingen / CH | [2009/48] | Application number, filing date | 08717245.8 | 29.02.2008 | [2009/48] | WO2008EP52464 | Priority number, date | EP20070103869 | 09.03.2007 Original published format: EP 07103869 | EP20070119346 | 26.10.2007 Original published format: EP 07119346 | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008110466 | Date: | 18.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2122739 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/40, C07D233/30, C07D233/32, C07D241/08, C07D265/32, H01M4/48, H01M4/50, H01M4/52, H01M4/58 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
C07D233/32 (EP,US);
H01M10/05 (KR);
C07D233/42 (EP,US);
C07D235/02 (EP,US);
C07D241/08 (EP,US);
C07D241/52 (EP,US);
C07D243/14 (EP,US);
C07D265/32 (EP,US);
C07D265/34 (EP,US);
C07D265/36 (EP,US);
C07D405/06 (EP,US);
C07F9/6584 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M10/0567 (EP,US);
H01M10/4235 (EP,US);
H01M10/44 (KR);
H01M10/0568 (EP,US);
H01M10/0569 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | NITROXIDE FÜR LITHIUMIONEN-AKKUS | [2009/48] | English: | NITROXIDES FOR LITHIUM-ION BATTERIES | [2009/48] | French: | NITROXYDES POUR DES BATTERIES LITHIUM-ION | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 12.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/13] | 29.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO2006124389 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [DA] 1-16 * P. 2, paragraph [0006] - P. 3, paragraph [0008]; P. 8, paragraph [0034] - P. 11, paragraph [0036], esp. Table A; Examples, esp. Table 1; Claims 1, 2, 7, 8, 14-17 & 19 *; | [A]EP1381100 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-16 * P. 2, paragraph [0007] - P. 3, paragraph [0011]; P. 4, paragraph [0022]; Examples; Claims 1-5 *; | [DA]EP1128453 (NEC CORP [JP]) [DA] 1-16 * P. 2-3, paragraph [0008]; P. 6, paragraph [0022] - P. 7, paragraph [0025]; P. 14, paragraph [0056] - P. 15, paragraph [0059]; Examples 1, 6, 9, 10 & 21; Claims 1, 2, 15-18, 45 & 47 *; | [A]JP2000268861 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [DA]WO0123435 (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) [DA] 16 * P. 3, line 20 - P. 4, line 2; P. 5, lines 12-29; P. 8, lines 8-22; Examples 2-6; Claims 1, 5, 18 & 23 *; | [DA]DE19845298 (BASF AG [DE]) [DA] 16 * P. 2, line 63 - P. 4, line 4; Examples 1 & 2; Claims 1-3 *; | [DA]FR2788272 (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]) [DA] 16 * P. 3, lines 3-20; P. 6, lines 3-17; P. 7, lines 3-12; P. 8, lines 8-16; P. 11, line 16 - P. 12, line 1; Example 1; Claims 1, 10 & 11 *; | [A]US3532703 (MURAYAMA KEISUKE, et al) [A] 16 * Col. 1, lines 24-52; Col. 2, lines 24-43; Examples; Claim 1 *; | [DA]US6479608 (NESVADBA PETER [CH], et al) [DA] 16 * Col. 2, lines 49-63; Col. 20, line 42 - Col. 21, line 62; Examples A4, B1, B5, B11, B26, B30, B34, B37, B57, B62, B68, B74, B77, B88, C3, C6, C8, C11, C12, C16 & Tables 1-3; Claims 1, 24 & 25 *; | [DA] - J.T. LAI, "Hindered Amines - III. Highly Regioselective Syntheses of 1,3,3,5,5-Pentasubstituted 2-Piperazinones and their Nitroxyl Radicals", SYNTHESIS, (1981), vol. 1981, no. 1, pages 40 - 42, XP002458594 [DA] 16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-1981-29325 | [DA] - T. YOSHIOKA ET AL., "Studies on Stable Free Radicals - XIII. Synthesis and ESR Spectral Properties of Hindered Piperazine N-Oxyls", BULLETIN OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (197206), vol. 45, no. 6, ISSN 0009-2673, pages 1855 - 1860, XP000960842 [DA] 16 * the whole document * | [DA] - T. TODA ET AL., "Studies on Stable Free Radicals - VI. Synthesis of Substituted 4-Imidazolidinone-1-oxyls", BULLETIN OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (197112), vol. 44, no. 12, ISSN 0009-2673, pages 3445 - 3450, XP002068001 [DA] 16 * the whole document * | [DA] - R. RAMASSEUL ET AL., "Nitroxydes LXXII : Préparation d'amines et d'ammonium quaternaires nitroxydes curarisants potentiels", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (197502), vol. 16, no. 11, pages 839 - 841, XP002480097 [DA] 16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)71998-8 |