EP2134388 - A MEDICATION DELIVERY DEVICE COMPRISING A PLURALITY OF RESERVOIRS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [2009/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLEJBØL, Kristian Kvædehaven 109 DK-2600 Glostrup / DK | 02 /
MERSEBACH, Frank Daniel Rygårds Alle 52 DK-2900 Hellerup / DK | 03 /
LANGKJÆR, Mette Ingrid Holmevej 2B DK-2950 Vedbæk / DK | 04 /
JEPPESEN, Per Bavnevangen 11 DK-2700 Brønshøj / DK | 05 /
MADSEN, Niels Berg Østtoften 25 DK-4040 Jyllinge / DK | [2009/52] | Application number, filing date | 08717258.1 | 29.02.2008 | [2009/52] | WO2008EP52477 | Priority number, date | EP20070103685 | 07.03.2007 Original published format: EP 07103685 | [2009/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008107378 | Date: | 12.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2134388 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2134388 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/142, A61M5/145, A61M5/148, A61M5/14 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
A61M5/148 (EP,US);
A61M5/31596 (EP,US);
A61M2005/1787 (EP,US);
A61M5/19 (EP,US);
A61M5/204 (EP,US);
A61M5/31573 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/52] | Title | German: | ARZNEIABGABEVORRICHTUNG MIT EINER VIELZAHL VON RESERVOIRS | [2009/52] | English: | A MEDICATION DELIVERY DEVICE COMPRISING A PLURALITY OF RESERVOIRS | [2009/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENT COMPRENANT UNE PLURALITÉ DE RÉSERVOIRS | [2009/52] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 07.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.09.2013
24.09.2013
ADMISSIBLE Norton Healthcare Limited Ridings Point Whistler Drive Castleford West Yorkshire WF10 5HX / GB Opponent's representative Cottam, David William, et al, et al Teva UK Ltd. Global Patent Group Field House Station Approach Harlow, Essex CM20 2FB / GB | [2014/36] |
Former [2013/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.09.2013
24.09.2013
ADMISSIBLE Norton Healthcare Limited Ridings Point Whistler Drive Castleford West Yorkshire WF10 5HX / GB Opponent's representative Wallin, Nicholas James, et al, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | 28.10.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.07.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 14.08.2014 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.02.2008 | AT | 19.12.2012 | BE | 19.12.2012 | CH | 19.12.2012 | CY | 19.12.2012 | CZ | 19.12.2012 | DK | 19.12.2012 | EE | 19.12.2012 | FI | 19.12.2012 | HR | 19.12.2012 | IT | 19.12.2012 | LI | 19.12.2012 | LT | 19.12.2012 | LV | 19.12.2012 | MT | 19.12.2012 | NL | 19.12.2012 | PL | 19.12.2012 | RO | 19.12.2012 | SE | 19.12.2012 | SI | 19.12.2012 | SK | 19.12.2012 | TR | 19.12.2012 | IE | 28.02.2013 | LU | 28.02.2013 | BG | 19.03.2013 | NO | 19.03.2013 | GR | 20.03.2013 | ES | 30.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | IS | 19.04.2013 | PT | 19.04.2013 | [2022/27] |
Former [2015/34] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CH | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
MT | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
IE | 28.02.2013 | ||
LU | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CH | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
MT | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
IE | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
MT | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
IE | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
IE | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
HR | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 19.12.2012 | |
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 19.12.2012 | |
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 19.12.2012 | |
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 19.12.2012 | |
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 19.12.2012 | |
NO | 19.03.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003014014 (NITZAN ZVI [IL]) [A] 1-21* column W *; | [A]US2004044332 (STERGIOPULOS NIKOLAUS [CH]) [A] 1-21 * column W *; | [A]FR2850027 (MEDEX SA [FR]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005214129 (GREENE HOWARD L [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * column W * |