EP2129444 - FILTER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAHLE International GmbH Pragstrasse 26-46 70376 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÜBLER, Udo Kirchstrasse 1 74613 Öhringen / DE | 02 /
STÖTZER, Dietrich Rymann-Strasse 3 74613 Öhringen / DE | [2009/50] | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/20] |
Former [2009/51] | Bongen, Renaud & Partner Rechtsanwälte Notare Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2009/50] | Bongen, Renaud & Partner Rechtsanwälte Notare Patentanwälte Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 08717727.5 | 13.03.2008 | [2009/50] | WO2008EP52983 | Priority number, date | DE20071014573 | 23.03.2007 Original published format: DE102007014573 | [2009/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008116758 | Date: | 02.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2129444 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2129444 | Date: | 13.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01D33/00, B01D29/11, B01D29/54, B01D29/68, B01D33/39, B01D33/50 | [2014/52] | CPC: |
B01D29/114 (EP,US);
B01D29/54 (EP,US);
B01D29/682 (EP,US);
B01D33/073 (EP,US);
B01D33/39 (EP,US);
B01D33/50 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/50] | B01D29/68, B01D29/54, B01D35/30, B01D29/94, B01D29/15 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/20] |
Former [2009/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | FILTERANLAGE | [2009/50] | English: | FILTER SYSTEM | [2009/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FILTRATION | [2009/50] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/50] | 28.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.11.2014 | 25.11.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.03.2008 | CY | 13.05.2015 | CZ | 13.05.2015 | DK | 13.05.2015 | EE | 13.05.2015 | ES | 13.05.2015 | FI | 13.05.2015 | HR | 13.05.2015 | IT | 13.05.2015 | LT | 13.05.2015 | LV | 13.05.2015 | MC | 13.05.2015 | MT | 13.05.2015 | NL | 13.05.2015 | PL | 13.05.2015 | RO | 13.05.2015 | SE | 13.05.2015 | SI | 13.05.2015 | SK | 13.05.2015 | TR | 13.05.2015 | BG | 13.08.2015 | NO | 13.08.2015 | GR | 14.08.2015 | IS | 13.09.2015 | PT | 14.09.2015 | [2018/33] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 13.03.2008 | |
CY | 13.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
MT | 13.05.2015 | ||
NL | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SE | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | CZ | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
MT | 13.05.2015 | ||
NL | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SE | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CZ | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | DK | 13.05.2015 | |
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | DK | 13.05.2015 | |
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 13.05.2015 | |
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 13.05.2015 | |
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE4009552 (KNECHT FILTERWERKE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-10 * columns 1-3; figure 1 *; | [X]WO0151167 (HYDAC FILTERTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,8-10 * page 3, lines 4-12 * * page 5, lines 12-20 * * page 7, line 4 - page 8, line 28 * * page 10, line 15 - page 11, line 16; figures 1-3 * * page 1, line 1 *; | [A]DE20014299U (BOLL & KIRCH FILTER [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 * | Examination | GB550358 | GB1440814 | DE4311710 |