EP2146898 - REAR LOWER AERODYNAMIC FAIRING FOR THE ATTACHMENT DEVICE OF AN AIRCRAFT ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2011 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIRBUS OPERATIONS 316 Route de Bayonne 31060 Toulouse / FR | [2010/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUMONT, Jean-François 3, lotissement le coteau de Pauillac F-31530 Thil / FR | 02 /
ROCHE, Frédéric Plano des Salos F-31530 Bretx / FR | [2010/04] | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe BREVALEX 95, Rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/04] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 08717729.1 | 13.03.2008 | [2010/04] | WO2008EP52985 | Priority number, date | FR20070053890 | 16.03.2007 Original published format: FR 0753890 | [2010/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008113737 | Date: | 25.09.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2146898 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2146898 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B64D29/06 | [2010/04] | CPC: |
B64D29/02 (EP,US);
B64D33/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/04] | Title | German: | HINTERE, UNTERE AERODYNAMISCHE VERKLEIDUNG FÜR DIE BEFESTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG EINES FLUGZEUGMOTORS | [2010/04] | English: | REAR LOWER AERODYNAMIC FAIRING FOR THE ATTACHMENT DEVICE OF AN AIRCRAFT ENGINE | [2010/04] | French: | CARENAGE AERODYNAMIQUE ARRIERE INFERIEUR POUR DISPOSITIF D' ACCROCHAGE D' UN MOTEUR D' AERONEF | [2010/04] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2009 | Examination requested [2010/04] | 23.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.12.2010 | CY | 08.12.2010 | CZ | 08.12.2010 | DK | 08.12.2010 | EE | 08.12.2010 | FI | 08.12.2010 | HR | 08.12.2010 | HU | 08.12.2010 | IE | 08.12.2010 | LT | 08.12.2010 | LV | 08.12.2010 | MT | 08.12.2010 | NL | 08.12.2010 | PL | 08.12.2010 | RO | 08.12.2010 | SE | 08.12.2010 | SI | 08.12.2010 | SK | 08.12.2010 | TR | 08.12.2010 | BG | 08.03.2011 | NO | 08.03.2011 | GR | 09.03.2011 | LU | 13.03.2011 | ES | 19.03.2011 | BE | 31.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | IS | 08.04.2011 | PT | 08.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
MT | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
TR | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
LU | 13.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
MT | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
LU | 13.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
MT | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
HR | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
NO | 08.03.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5524846 (SHINE PAUL R [US], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US2003201366 (CONNELLY THOMAS J [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * |