EP2132288 - DETERGENT COMPOSITION CONTAINING BLEACHING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/51] | BLEACH-CONTAINING DETERGENT OR CLEANING AGENT | ||
[2012/18] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 25.01.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2019 | Revocation of patent | published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] | 25.01.2019 | New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIEDEL, Peter Graudenzer Strasse 27 40599 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
SCHOLL, Elke Friederike-Fliedner-Weg 54 40489 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
RYBINSKI VON, Wolfgang Leinenweberweg 12 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | 04 /
ROSENKRANZ, Christian Kattowitzer Str. 10 40231 Düsseldorf / DE | 05 /
HÖLSKEN, Sören Am Steinebrück 17c 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | 06 /
GUCKENBIEHL, Bernhard Kasseler Weg 107 50769 Köln / DE | [2009/51] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/37] | Application number, filing date | 08717747.3 | 13.03.2008 | [2009/51] | WO2008EP53003 | Priority number, date | DE20071016709 | 04.04.2007 Original published format: DE102007016709 | DE20071057351 | 27.11.2007 Original published format: DE102007057351 | [2009/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008122478 | Date: | 16.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2132288 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2132288 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/10, C11D1/62, C11D3/00, C11D3/02, C11D3/20, C11D3/28, C11D3/30, C11D3/36, C11D3/37, C11D3/39 | [2009/51] | CPC: |
C11D3/3945 (EP,US);
C11D1/10 (EP,US);
C11D1/62 (EP,US);
C11D3/0073 (EP,US);
C11D3/046 (EP,US);
C11D3/048 (EP,US);
C11D3/2075 (EP,US);
C11D3/28 (EP,US);
C11D3/30 (EP,US);
C11D3/36 (EP,US);
C11D3/3719 (EP,US);
C11D3/3765 (EP,US);
C11D3/3947 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/51] | Title | German: | BLEICHMITTELHALTIGES WASCH- ODER REINIGUNGSMITTEL | [2009/51] | English: | DETERGENT COMPOSITION CONTAINING BLEACHING AGENT | [2012/18] | French: | COMPOSITION DÉTERGENTE CONTENANT UN AGENT DE BLANCHIMENT | [2012/18] |
Former [2009/51] | BLEACH-CONTAINING DETERGENT OR CLEANING AGENT | ||
Former [2009/51] | DÉTERGENTS CONTENANT UN AGENT DE BLANCHIMENT | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 25.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.06.2013
ADMISSIBLE Dalli-Werke GmbH & Co. KG Zweifaller Strasse 120 52224 Stolberg / DE Opponent's representative f & e patent, et al, et al Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 02
12.06.2013
ADMISSIBLE Reckitt Benckiser (Brands) Limited 103-105 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3UH / GB Opponent's representative Hewett, Erica Louise, et al, et al Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull, East Yorkshire HU8 7DS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.06.2013
ADMISSIBLE Dalli-Werke GmbH & Co. KG Zweifaller Strasse 120 52224 Stolberg / DE Opponent's representative polypatent BGL, et al, et al Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
02
12.06.2013
ADMISSIBLE Reckitt Benckiser (Brands) Limited 103-105 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3UH / GB Opponent's representative Orton, Erica Louise, et al, et al Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Ltd. Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull, HU8 7DS / GB | 22.07.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.11.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.03.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.05.2015 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.05.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.12.2018 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2019/09] | 15.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 09.07.2015 | Appeal received No. T1416/15 | 24.09.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.12.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 07.12.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.12.2018 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.03.2008 | CY | 12.09.2012 | DK | 12.09.2012 | EE | 12.09.2012 | FI | 12.09.2012 | HR | 12.09.2012 | LT | 12.09.2012 | LV | 12.09.2012 | MT | 12.09.2012 | NL | 12.09.2012 | RO | 12.09.2012 | SE | 12.09.2012 | SI | 12.09.2012 | SK | 12.09.2012 | BG | 12.12.2012 | NO | 12.12.2012 | GR | 13.12.2012 | IS | 12.01.2013 | PT | 14.01.2013 | AT | 13.03.2013 | GB | 13.03.2013 | IE | 13.03.2013 | LU | 13.03.2013 | BE | 31.03.2013 | CH | 31.03.2013 | LI | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/37] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
MT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
AT | 13.03.2013 | ||
GB | 13.03.2013 | ||
IE | 13.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
MT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
GB | 13.03.2013 | ||
IE | 13.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
GB | 13.03.2013 | ||
IE | 13.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
IE | 13.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
IE | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 12.09.2012 | |
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 12.09.2012 | |
NO | 12.12.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0852259 (AUSIMONT SPA [IT]) [X] 1-3,6-9,14,15 * example -; claim - *; | [X]GB2323371 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-3,6-10,14,15* example -; claim - *; | [X]US2004033921 (DASQUE BRUNO MATTHIEU [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,9-12,15 * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO2004053038 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,6-9,11,12,15,16 * page 8 - page 9; example -; claim - *; | [X]EP1717302 (MIFA AG FRENKENDORF [CH]) [X] 1-3,6,9-12,15 * claim -; table - *; | [X]WO2006120405 (RECKITT BENCKISER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,11,12,15 * page 17; example -; claim - * |