EP2110016 - ADJUSTMENT DEVICE FOR MANUAL CUTTING TOOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bellota Herramientas, S.a. Urola 10 20230 Legazpia Guipuzcoa / ES | [2009/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AZPEITIA URRESTARAZU, José María Urola, 10 E-20230 Legazpia (Guipúzcoa) / ES | [2009/43] | Representative(s) | Ungria López, Javier, et al Avda. Ramón y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | [2014/37] |
Former [2009/43] | Ungria Lopez, Javier, et al Avda. Ramón y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 08718443.8 | 28.01.2008 | [2009/43] | WO2008ES00042 | Priority number, date | ES20070000332U | 16.02.2007 Original published format: ES 200700332 U | [2009/43] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008099033 | Date: | 21.08.2008 | Language: | ES | [2008/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2110016 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2110016 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 21.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01G3/02, F16B39/02 | [2014/27] | CPC: |
F16B39/028 (EP,US);
A01G3/02 (EP,US);
A01G3/0251 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/28] | A01G3/025, F16B39/02 | ||
Former IPC [2009/43] | A01G3/025, F16B39/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/43] | Title | German: | EINSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR MANUELLE SCHNEIDWERKZEUGE | [2009/43] | English: | ADJUSTMENT DEVICE FOR MANUAL CUTTING TOOLS | [2009/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉGLAGE D'OUTILS MANUELS DE DÉCOUPE | [2009/43] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2009 | Translation filed | 19.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 19.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/43] | 15.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.01.2008 | AT | 10.09.2014 | BE | 10.09.2014 | BG | 10.09.2014 | CY | 10.09.2014 | CZ | 10.09.2014 | DK | 10.09.2014 | EE | 10.09.2014 | FI | 10.09.2014 | HR | 10.09.2014 | LT | 10.09.2014 | LV | 10.09.2014 | MC | 10.09.2014 | MT | 10.09.2014 | NL | 10.09.2014 | RO | 10.09.2014 | SE | 10.09.2014 | SI | 10.09.2014 | SK | 10.09.2014 | TR | 10.09.2014 | NO | 10.12.2014 | IS | 10.01.2015 | PT | 12.01.2015 | IE | 28.01.2015 | LU | 28.01.2015 | CH | 31.01.2015 | LI | 31.01.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
BE | 10.09.2014 | ||
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
MT | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
IE | 28.01.2015 | ||
LU | 28.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
BE | 10.09.2014 | ||
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
IE | 28.01.2015 | ||
LU | 28.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
IE | 28.01.2015 | ||
LU | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
LU | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
LU | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/43] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
LU | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
LU | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 10.09.2014 | |
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 10.09.2014 | |
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 10.09.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US326485 (DUFRANE J. L.) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [A]GB700410 (ALICE EDWARDS) [A] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO03080298 (CHUNXIAO SUN [ES]); | [A]US6128943 (LEMMENS JOSEPH R [US]); | [A]BE493829 ; | [A]US3237665 (JAMES BASS HENRY) |