EP2181011 - VEHICLE TRANSMISSION WITH A DRIVE DISCONNECT SYSTEM AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xtrac Limited Gables Way Kennet Park Thatcham, Berkshire RG19 4ZA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states Xtrac Limited Gables Way Kennet Park Thatcham, Berkshire RG19 4ZA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOLMELEY, Christopher, Guy 8 Trefoil Drive Thatcham Berkshire RG18 4EL / GB | 02 /
DICKINSON, Mel, Richard 4 Fir Tree Place Hannington NR Tadley Hampshire RG26 5UA / GB | 03 /
GARDNER, Christopher, James 21 Maltby Way Reading Berkshire RG6 4AE / GB | 04 /
MCCARDLE, James Pond Cottage Stanmore Road Beedon Newbury Berkshire RG20 8SW / GB | 05 /
MOORE, Adrian, Paul Cherwell Cottage Cold Ash Hill Cold Ash Berkshire RG18 9PS / GB | [2012/07] |
Former [2010/18] | 01 /
CHOLMELEY, Christopher, Guy 8 Trefoil Drive Thatcham Berkshire RG18 4EL / GB | ||
02 /
DICKINSON, Mel, Richard 4 Fir Tree Place Hannington NR Tadley Hampshire RG26 5UA / GB | |||
03 /
GARDNER, Christopher, James 21 Maltby Way Reading Berkshire RG6 4AE / GB | |||
04 /
MCCARDLE, James Pond Cottage Stanmore Road Beedon Newbury Berkshire RG20 8SW / GB | |||
05 /
MOORE, Adrian, Paul Cherwell Cottage Cold Ash Hill Cold Ash Berkshire RG18 9PS / GB | Representative(s) | Raynor, Simon Mark, et al Murgitroyd & Company Milton Keynes Studio H1B 297 Upper Fourth Street Witan Studios Milton Keynes MK9 1EH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/18] | Raynor, Simon Mark, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Midsummer House 413 Midsummer Boulevard Central Milton Keynes MK9 3BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 08718607.8 | 05.03.2008 | [2010/18] | WO2008GB00746 | Priority number, date | GB20070014572 | 26.07.2007 Original published format: GB 0714572 | GB20080002266 | 08.02.2008 Original published format: GB 0802266 | [2010/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009013446 | Date: | 29.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2181011 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2181011 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60K17/35, B60K23/08, B60W30/18 | [2010/18] | CPC: |
B60W30/1819 (EP,GB);
B60W10/10 (GB);
B60K23/08 (EP);
B60K23/0808 (GB);
B60W10/119 (EP);
B60W10/14 (EP);
B60W10/18 (GB);
B60W10/184 (EP);
B60W2510/186 (EP);
B60Y2200/114 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/18] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGGETRIEBE MIT ANTRIEBSUNTERBRECHUNGSSYSTEM UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2010/18] | English: | VEHICLE TRANSMISSION WITH A DRIVE DISCONNECT SYSTEM AND DEVICE | [2010/18] | French: | TRANSMISSION DE VÉHICULE À SYSTÈME DE DÉSACCOUPLAGE D'ENTRAÎNEMENT ET DISPOSITIF | [2010/18] | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/18] | 24.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.03.2008 | AT | 15.02.2012 | BE | 15.02.2012 | CY | 15.02.2012 | CZ | 15.02.2012 | DK | 15.02.2012 | EE | 15.02.2012 | FI | 15.02.2012 | HR | 15.02.2012 | IT | 15.02.2012 | LT | 15.02.2012 | LV | 15.02.2012 | MT | 15.02.2012 | NL | 15.02.2012 | PL | 15.02.2012 | RO | 15.02.2012 | SE | 15.02.2012 | SI | 15.02.2012 | SK | 15.02.2012 | TR | 15.02.2012 | IE | 05.03.2012 | LU | 05.03.2012 | CH | 31.03.2012 | LI | 31.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | BG | 15.05.2012 | NO | 15.05.2012 | GR | 16.05.2012 | ES | 26.05.2012 | IS | 15.06.2012 | PT | 15.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
MT | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
TR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 05.03.2012 | ||
LU | 05.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
ES | 26.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
MT | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
TR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 05.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
ES | 26.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
MT | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 05.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
ES | 26.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 05.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
ES | 26.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 05.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
ES | 26.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 05.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
HR | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 15.02.2012 | |
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 15.02.2012 | |
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 15.02.2012 | |
NO | 15.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3127605 (PORSCHE AG [DE]); | [X]JPS6334240 (MAZDA MOTOR); | [X]JPS63125436 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [X]JPH01111535 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD); | [X]JPH11278088 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [X]JP2002187447 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) | by applicant | JPS63125436 |