EP2139732 - TRAILER ELECTRONIC BRAKING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [2020/07] |
Former [2016/19] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRY, Matthew Knorr-Bremse Systeme fuer Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 Munich / DE | 02 /
MEDERER, Martin Knorr-Bremse Systeme fuer Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 Munich / DE | 03 /
STRAUB, Kornel Knorr-Bremse Systeme fuer Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 Munich / DE | 04 /
MERZA, Valer Knorr-Bremse Systeme fuer Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 Munich / DE | 05 /
SZABO, Gergely Knorr-Bremse Systeme fuer Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 Munich / DE | [2016/19] |
Former [2010/01] | 01 /
FRY, Matthew Knorr-Bremse Systeme fuer Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 Munich / DE | ||
02 /
MEDERER, Martin Knorr-Bremse Systeme fuer Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 Munich / DE | |||
03 /
STRAUB, Kornel Knorr-Bremse Systeme fuer Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 Munich / DE | |||
04 /
MERZA, Valer Knorr-Bremse Systeme fuer Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 Munich / DE | |||
05 /
SZABO, Gergely Knorr-Bremse Systeme fuer Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 Munich / DE | Representative(s) | JENSEN & SON 366-368 Old Street London EC1V 9LT / GB | [2020/07] |
Former [2016/19] | Schönmann, Kurt Knorr-Bremse Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/01] | Schönmann, Kurt Knorr-Bremse, Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08718844.7 | 25.03.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008GB01007 | Priority number, date | GB20070005520 | 22.03.2007 Original published format: GB 0705520 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008114029 | Date: | 25.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2139732 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2139732 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/19] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2139732 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/17, B60T8/1755, B62D37/00, B62D53/08 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
B60T8/1708 (EP,GB,US);
B60T7/20 (GB);
B60T8/17554 (EP,US);
B60T2230/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/19] |
Former [2010/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHES BREMSSYSTEM FÜR ANHÄNGER | [2015/50] | English: | TRAILER ELECTRONIC BRAKING SYSTEM | [2010/01] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FREINAGE ÉLECTRONIQUE DE REMORQUE | [2010/01] |
Former [2010/01] | ELEKTRONISCHES ANHÄNGERBREMSSYSTEM | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 11.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.02.2017
16.02.2017
ADMISSIBLE WABCO GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE | [2018/31] |
Former [2017/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.02.2017
WABCO GmbH & Co. OHG Am Lindener Hafen 21 D-30453 Hannover / DE | 21.03.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.09.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.03.2019 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.03.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.06.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.06.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 02.01.2020 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.03.2008 | AT | 11.05.2016 | BE | 11.05.2016 | BG | 11.05.2016 | CY | 11.05.2016 | CZ | 11.05.2016 | DK | 11.05.2016 | EE | 11.05.2016 | ES | 11.05.2016 | FI | 11.05.2016 | HR | 11.05.2016 | LT | 11.05.2016 | LV | 11.05.2016 | MC | 11.05.2016 | PL | 11.05.2016 | RO | 11.05.2016 | SI | 11.05.2016 | SK | 11.05.2016 | TR | 11.05.2016 | NO | 11.08.2016 | GR | 12.08.2016 | IS | 11.09.2016 | PT | 12.09.2016 | IE | 25.03.2017 | LU | 25.03.2017 | MT | 25.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 25.03.2008 | |
AT | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
BG | 11.05.2016 | ||
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
TR | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
IE | 25.03.2017 | ||
LU | 25.03.2017 | ||
MT | 25.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 25.03.2008 | |
AT | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
BG | 11.05.2016 | ||
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
IE | 25.03.2017 | ||
LU | 25.03.2017 | ||
MT | 25.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 25.03.2008 | |
AT | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
BG | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
IE | 25.03.2017 | ||
LU | 25.03.2017 | ||
MT | 25.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 25.03.2008 | |
AT | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
IE | 25.03.2017 | ||
LU | 25.03.2017 | ||
MT | 25.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 11.05.2016 | |
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
IE | 25.03.2017 | ||
LU | 25.03.2017 | ||
MT | 25.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 11.05.2016 | |
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
IE | 25.03.2017 | ||
LU | 25.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 11.05.2016 | |
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
LU | 25.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 11.05.2016 | |
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 11.05.2016 | |
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 11.05.2016 | |
BE | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 11.05.2016 | |
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 11.05.2016 | |
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 11.05.2016 | |
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 11.05.2016 | |
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 11.05.2016 | |
NO | 11.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6225894 (KYRTSOS CHRISTOS T [US]); | [A]EP1186510 (WABCO GMBH & CO OHG [DE]); | [Y]DE102004036089 (WABCO GMBH & CO OHG [DE]); | [Y]WO2007008150 (VOLVO LASTVAGNAR AB [SE], et al) | Opposition | US5142278 | US6225894 | US2001040408 | EP1186510 | DE10238221 | DE10216564 | US6758536 | EP1459949 | EP1142768 | WO2004113140 | EP1571058 | DE102004036089 | DE102005029716 | WO2007008150 | EP1902917 | EP1142768 |