EP2134791 - Use of textile reinforcing fibres deriving from rubber waste recycling for the production of bituminous plates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/52] | USE OF TEXTILE REINFORCING FIBRES DERIVING FROM RUBBER WASTE RECYCLING FOR THE PRODUCTION OF BITUMINOUS PLATES | ||
[2010/23] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 17.05.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, IE, LI, LU, MC, MT, TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Villas Austria Gmbh 9586 Fürnitz / AT | [2009/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EIZINGER, Horst lisengasse 22 A-9500 Villach / AT | 02 /
SCHNEGG, Elmar Bergstrasse 5/9 A-9545 Radenthein / AT | [2009/52] | Representative(s) | von Füner, Nicolai Von Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Patentanwälte Mariahilfplatz 3 81541 München / DE | [2009/52] | Application number, filing date | 08719253.0 | 10.03.2008 | [2009/52] | WO2008IB00544 | Priority number, date | HU20070000220 | 13.03.2007 Original published format: HU 0700220 | [2009/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008120053 | Date: | 09.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2134791 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2134791 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08L95/00 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
C08J5/046 (EP);
C08J5/045 (EP);
C08L95/00 (EP);
E04D5/02 (EP);
C08J2395/00 (EP);
Y02W30/62 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L95/00, C08L21/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/52] | Title | German: | Verwendung von textilen Armierungsfasern aus der Rezyklierung von Gummiabfällen zur Herstellung bituminöser Platten | [2010/23] | English: | Use of textile reinforcing fibres deriving from rubber waste recycling for the production of bituminous plates | [2010/23] | French: | Utilisation de fibres de renforcement de textile issues du recyclage de déchets de caoutchouc pour la production de plaques bitumineuses | [2010/23] |
Former [2009/52] | VERWENDUNG VON TEXTILEN ARMIERUNGSFASERN AUS DER REZYKLIERUNG VON GUMMIABFÄLLEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG BITUMINÖSER PLATTEN | ||
Former [2009/52] | USE OF TEXTILE REINFORCING FIBRES DERIVING FROM RUBBER WASTE RECYCLING FOR THE PRODUCTION OF BITUMINOUS PLATES | ||
Former [2009/52] | UTILISATION DE FIBRES DE RENFORCEMENT DE TEXTILE ISSUES DU RECYCLAGE DE DÉCHETS DE CAOUTCHOUC POUR LA PRODUCTION DE PLAQUES BITUMINEUSES | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 23.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.08.2011
15.09.2011
WITHDRAWN ART Asamer Rubber Technology GmbH Unterthalhamstrasse 2 4694 Ohlsdorf / AT Opponent's representative Ofner, Clemens, et al, et al Anwälte Burger & Partner Rechtsanwalt GmbH Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.08.2011
ADMISSIBLE ART Asamer Rubber Technology GmbH Unterthalhamstrasse 2 4694 Ohlsdorf / AT Opponent's representative Ofner, Clemens Anwälte Burger & Partner Rechtsanwalt GmbH Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | 14.09.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.01.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 14.02.2013 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2013/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.11.2010 | EE | 10.11.2010 | HR | 10.11.2010 | LT | 10.11.2010 | LV | 10.11.2010 | MT | 10.11.2010 | RO | 10.11.2010 | SI | 10.11.2010 | TR | 10.11.2010 | BG | 10.02.2011 | NO | 10.02.2011 | GR | 11.02.2011 | IE | 10.03.2011 | IS | 10.03.2011 | LU | 10.03.2011 | PT | 10.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | CH | 31.03.2012 | LI | 31.03.2012 | [2013/44] |
Former [2011/38] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
HR | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
NO | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0483995 (FIBRESCREED LTD [GB]) [X] 1-5 * column 1, line 1 - line 4 * * column 1, line 36 - line 39 * * column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 2 * * column 2, line 8 - line 26 * * column 2, line 35 - line 40 * * claims 1-6,8 * [Y] 1-5; | [Y]WO9749555 (CERTAIN TEED CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * page 1, line 2 - line 5 * * page 2, line 17 - line 31 * * page 4, line 6 - page 5, line 22 * * page 6, line 31 - page 7, line 3 * * claims 1,5,8 *; | [XY]WO0202889 (GARLAND COMPANY [US]) [X] 1-5 * page 1, line 1 - line 2 * * page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 8 * * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 2 * * claims 1-3,15 * [Y] 1-5; | [YD]WO2004089610 (BAHARDOUST MOHAMMAD HASSAN [AT], et al) [YD] 1-5 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph 7 * * page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 11, paragraph 1 * * example - ** claims 1,6,14,19,22 *; | [Y]WO2007011249 (INST BADAWCZY DROG I MOSTOW [PL], et al) [Y] 1-5 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * page 3, paragraph 7 - page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph 1 - paragraph 4 * * example - * * claims 1-3,6,9,10,13,14 * |