EP2139728 - ADAPTIVE HEAD AND NECK RESTRAINT SYSTEM FOR A PERSON IN A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xceed Holdings Close Corporation 50 Kiepersol Crescent Atlas Gardens Durbanville 7550 / ZA | [2011/39] |
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states Xceed Holdings (Pty) Ltd 50 Kiepersol Crescent Atlas Gardens 7550 Durbanville / ZA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NELSON, Grant Leigh 37 Alpina Road Claremont Cape Town / ZA | [2012/22] |
Former [2010/01] | 01 /
NELSON, Grant Leigh 37 Alpina Road, Claremont Cape Town / ZA | Representative(s) | Jappy, John William Graham Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2012/22] |
Former [2010/01] | Jappy, John William Graham Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 08719762.0 | 19.03.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008IB51037 | Priority number, date | ZA20070002327 | 20.03.2007 Original published format: ZA 200702327 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008114215 | Date: | 25.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2139728 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2139728 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/00, B60R22/14 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
B60R22/001 (EP,US);
A42B3/0473 (EP,US);
B60R2022/027 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | ADAPTIVES KOPF- UND NACKENSTÜTZSYSTEM FÜR EINE PERSON IN EINEM FAHRZEUG | [2010/01] | English: | ADAPTIVE HEAD AND NECK RESTRAINT SYSTEM FOR A PERSON IN A VEHICLE | [2010/01] | French: | SYSTÈME ADAPTATIF DE RETENUE DE LA TÊTE ET DU COU POUR UNE PERSONNE DANS UN VÉHICULE | [2010/01] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 02.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.01.2012 | 25.01.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.03.2008 | AT | 30.05.2012 | BE | 30.05.2012 | CY | 30.05.2012 | CZ | 30.05.2012 | DK | 30.05.2012 | EE | 30.05.2012 | FI | 30.05.2012 | HR | 30.05.2012 | LT | 30.05.2012 | LV | 30.05.2012 | MT | 30.05.2012 | PL | 30.05.2012 | RO | 30.05.2012 | SI | 30.05.2012 | SK | 30.05.2012 | TR | 30.05.2012 | BG | 30.08.2012 | NO | 30.08.2012 | GR | 31.08.2012 | IS | 30.09.2012 | PT | 01.10.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
MT | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
TR | 30.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
MT | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 30.05.2012 | |
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 30.05.2012 | |
NO | 30.08.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9938401 (HUBBARD ROBERT P [US]) [A] 1* figure - *; | [A]US6751809 (COOPER JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]EP1462363 (SCHROTH SAFETY PRODUCTS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US6810535 (MOLONEY JOHN [US]) [A] 1 * figure - * | by applicant | WO9938401 | US6751809 | EP1462363 | US6810535 |