EP2116998 - POST-FILTER, DECODING DEVICE, AND POST-FILTER PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states III Holdings 12, LLC 2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400 Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | [2017/25] |
Former [2014/30] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue Suite 200 Torrance CA 90503 / US | ||
Former [2009/46] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSHIKIRI, Masahiro c/o Panasonic Corporation, IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2018/33] |
Former [2009/46] | 01 /
OSHIKIRI, Masahiro c/o Panasonic Corporation, I.P.R.O.C. 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi Chuo-Ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/33] |
Former [2009/46] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08720313.9 | 29.02.2008 | [2009/46] | WO2008JP00399 | Priority number, date | JP20070053528 | 02.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007053528 | [2009/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008120438 | Date: | 09.10.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2116998 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2116998 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/26, G10L19/24 | [2018/11] | CPC: |
G10L19/24 (EP,US);
G10L19/26 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/46] | G10L19/14, G10L19/00, G10L19/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/33] |
Former [2009/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | POST-FILTER, DEKODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND POST-FILTERVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2018/11] | English: | POST-FILTER, DECODING DEVICE, AND POST-FILTER PROCESSING METHOD | [2009/46] | French: | POST-FILTRE, DISPOSITIF DE DÉCODAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE POST-FILTRE | [2009/46] |
Former [2009/46] | POSTFILTER, DEKODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND POSTFILTERVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2009 | Translation filed | 28.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 28.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 01.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.02.2008 | AT | 15.08.2018 | CY | 15.08.2018 | CZ | 15.08.2018 | DK | 15.08.2018 | EE | 15.08.2018 | ES | 15.08.2018 | FI | 15.08.2018 | HR | 15.08.2018 | IT | 15.08.2018 | LT | 15.08.2018 | LV | 15.08.2018 | MC | 15.08.2018 | NL | 15.08.2018 | PL | 15.08.2018 | RO | 15.08.2018 | SE | 15.08.2018 | SI | 15.08.2018 | SK | 15.08.2018 | TR | 15.08.2018 | BG | 15.11.2018 | NO | 15.11.2018 | GR | 16.11.2018 | IS | 15.12.2018 | PT | 15.12.2018 | BE | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | IE | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | LU | 28.02.2019 | MT | 28.02.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CY | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
PT | 15.12.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
MT | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
PT | 15.12.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
MT | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
IE | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
LU | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 15.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO9938155 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al) [AD] 1-7* the whole document *; | [XAYI]US2002107686 (UNNO TAKAHIRO [US]) [X] 1,6,7 * paragraphs [0039] - [0052] * * figures 2a, 2b, 3c * [A] 4 [Y] 5 [I] 2,3; | [YA]WO2007010158 (FRANCE TELECOM [FR], et al) [Y] 5 * page 5, lines 13-32 * * page 11, line 13 - page 15, line 26 * * figures 2,4 * [A] 1-4,6,7 | International search | [A]JPH1055199 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONIC); | [A]JP2004102186 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]WO2005106850 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2005112005 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2006098274 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2002501225 | JP2007053528 | - All about MPEG-4, KOGYO CHOSAKAI PUBLISHING, INC., (19980930), pages 126 - 127 | - J.-H. CHEN; A. GERSHO, "Adaptive postfiltering for quality enhancement of coded speech", IEEE TRANS. SPEECH AND AUDIO PROCESSING, (1995), vol. SAP-3, doi:doi:10.1109/89.365380, pages 59 - 71, XP055104008 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/89.365380 |