18.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
30.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
26.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
14.06.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] |
26.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
01.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] |
18.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
11.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] |
19.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
17.08.2012 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] |
10.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] |
03.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
27.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] |
20.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] |
08.06.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2012 [2012/28] |
01.06.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2012 [2012/27] |
18.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] |
11.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] |
04.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] |
21.04.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] |
13.04.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.05.2012 [2012/20] |
09.09.2011 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] |
01.09.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.09.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
04.04.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.04.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.03.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] |
25.03.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] |
14.01.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
16.07.2010 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] |
14.05.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] |
31.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.10.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] |
16.10.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] |
14.10.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.09.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.09.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.08.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.10.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.09.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.09.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|