Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8251136 | Global Dossier | 28.08.2012 | B2 | US2010218919 | 02.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007063182 | 13.03.2007 | WO2008JP00538 | 12.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2120524 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2011 | B1 | EP2120524 | 18.08.2010 | A4 | EP2120524 | 18.11.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007063182 | 13.03.2007 | WO2008JP00538 | 12.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE528980T | 15.10.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007063182 | 13.03.2007 | WO2008JP00538 | 12.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101632332B | 04.04.2012 | B | CN101632332 | 20.01.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007063182 | 13.03.2007 | WO2008JP00538 | 12.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2120524T | 30.01.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2007063182 | 13.03.2007 | WO2008JP00538 | 12.03.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008111310 | Global Dossier | 18.09.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2007063182 | 13.03.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4867727B | Global Dossier | 01.02.2012 | B2 | JP2008227136 | 25.09.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007063182 | 13.03.2007 |